Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean F Cox
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:17-cv-11084
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2017
Re-opened:Nov 23, 2021
Terminated:Jun 22, 2022
Case in other court:U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit, 19-01633
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 03, 2017 5:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Treva Eaton
Represented By
Gregory B. Paddison
City Of Detroit
contact info
Defendant
Darell Fitzgerald
Represented By
Gregory B. Paddison
City Of Detroit
contact info
Defendant
Mitchell Quinn
Represented By
Theresa M. Urbanic
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Nelda Kellom
Represented By
Nabih H. Ayad
Ayad Law, P.L.L.C.
contact info

GPO Mar 27 2018
OPINION AND ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal). Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
GPO Aug 29 2018
gned by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)OPINION and ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART re 36 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Counts in the Amended Complaint, 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Tort Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and 34 MOTION to Dismiss. Si
GPO May 21 2019
ORDER Deeming as Moot 58 Motion for Reconsideration; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 78 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 79 Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
GPO Sep 04 2019
OPINION AND ORDER on Motions in Limine re 129 Motion in Limine; 130 Motion in Limine; 131 Motion in Limine; 132 Motion in Limine; 133 Motion in Limine; 134 Motion in Limine; 135 Motion in Limine; 136 Motion in Limine; 137 Motion in Limine; 138 Motion in Limine; 139 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
GPO Jan 28 2020
ORDER Denying 219 Motion for Free Transcript Pursuant to Court Reporters Act; Denying 220 Motion Free Transcript Pursuant to Court Reporters Act. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
GPO Jun 21 2022
OPINION AND ORDER re 244 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
258 258 appeal Appeal/Supreme Court Letter Tue 06/18 12:12 PM
LETTER from the US Supreme Court denying the petition for writ of certiorari [Supreme Court Case Number: 23-1143 [Court of Appeals Case Number: 22-1591 22-1592 (JHea)
Related: [-]