Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Carmen C Cerezo
Case #: 3:17-cv-01457
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2017
Terminated:Apr 20, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 03, 2017 5:24 AM AST
Defendant
Wanda Llovet Diaz
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
P. R. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Rafael Rodriguez Mercado
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
P. R. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Ricardo Rossello Nevares
Represented By
Idza Diaz-Rivera
P. R. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez
268 Muoz Rivera Avenue Suite 1500
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Demoya Gordon
contact info
Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Lambda Leal Defense & Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Kara Nicole Ingelhart
Lambda Legal Defense & Education Fund
contact info
Aliki Sofis
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
David C. Soutter
Prudential Tower
contact info
Celina Romany-Siaca
Celina Romany Law Office
contact info
Sara Perkins Jones
Prudential Tower
contact info
Richard D. Batchelder
Prudential Tower
contact info
R. Daniel O'Connor
Prudential Tower
contact info
Bonnie C. Doyle
contact info
M. Dru Levasseur
contact info
Plaintiff
Joanna Cifredo
268 Muoz Rivera Avenue Suite 1500
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Demoya Gordon
contact info
Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Lambda Leal Defense & Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Kara Nicole Ingelhart
Lambda Legal Defense & Education Fund
contact info
Aliki Sofis
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
David C. Soutter
Prudential Tower
contact info
Celina Romany-Siaca
Celina Romany Law Office
contact info
Sara Perkins Jones
Prudential Tower
contact info
Richard D. Batchelder
Prudential Tower
contact info
R. Daniel O'Connor
Prudential Tower
contact info
Bonnie C. Doyle
contact info
M. Dru Levasseur
contact info
Plaintiff
J.G.
Represented By
Demoya Gordon
contact info
Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Lambda Leal Defense & Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Kara Nicole Ingelhart
Lambda Legal Defense & Education Fund
contact info
Aliki Sofis
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
David C. Soutter
Prudential Tower
contact info
Celina Romany-Siaca
Celina Romany Law Office
contact info
Sara Perkins Jones
Prudential Tower
contact info
Richard D. Batchelder
Prudential Tower
contact info
R. Daniel O'Connor
Prudential Tower
contact info
Bonnie C. Doyle
contact info
M. Dru Levasseur
contact info
Plaintiff
Puerto Rico Para Tod@s
Represented By
Demoya Gordon
contact info
Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Lambda Leal Defense & Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Kara Nicole Ingelhart
Lambda Legal Defense & Education Fund
contact info
Aliki Sofis
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
David C. Soutter
Prudential Tower
contact info
Celina Romany-Siaca
Celina Romany Law Office
contact info
Sara Perkins Jones
Prudential Tower
contact info
Richard D. Batchelder
Prudential Tower
contact info
R. Daniel O'Connor
Prudential Tower
contact info
Bonnie C. Doyle
contact info
M. Dru Levasseur
contact info
Plaintiff
Victoria Rodriguez Roldan
268 Muoz Rivera Avenue Suite 1500
San Juan, PR 00918
Represented By
Demoya Gordon
contact info
Omar Gonzalez-Pagan
Lambda Leal Defense & Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Kara Nicole Ingelhart
Lambda Legal Defense & Education Fund
contact info
Aliki Sofis
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
David C. Soutter
Prudential Tower
contact info
Celina Romany-Siaca
Celina Romany Law Office
contact info
Sara Perkins Jones
Prudential Tower
contact info
Richard D. Batchelder
Prudential Tower
contact info
R. Daniel O'Connor
Prudential Tower
contact info
Bonnie C. Doyle
contact info
M. Dru Levasseur
contact info

GPO Apr 20 2018
OPINION AND ORDER stating Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in support of 40 Order granting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 4/20/2018. (mld)
Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM AST
Friday, May 04, 2018
44 44 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/04 4:32 PM
NOTICE regarding attorney's fees and costs by Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Victoria Rodriguez Roldan (Gonzalez-Pagan, Omar)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
43 43 order Judgment Fri 04/20 1:22 PM
SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DISMISSING this action, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 4/20/2018. (mld)
Related: [-]
42 42 16 pgs order Opinion and Order Fri 04/20 1:17 PM
OPINION AND ORDER stating Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law in support of40 Order granting26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 4/20/2018. (mld)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
41 41 order Order Wed 04/04 2:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Clerk of Court is instructed to provide the Court with a certified English translation of form DTOP-DIS-324, revised on May 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 4/4/2018. (mld)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
40 40 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 04/03 5:25 PM
ORDER granted26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court to make findings in separate Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 3/28/2018. (mld)
Related: [-]
39 39 order Order Mon 04/02 4:42 PM
ORDER granted32 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of26 Motion for Summary Judgment. The reply tendered at docket entry 32-1 is authorized. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 3/28/2018. (mld)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 15, 2018
38 38 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/15 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities by Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Victoria Rodriguez Roldan re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Gonzalez-Pagan, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - F.V. v. Barron,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - EEOC v. R.G. & G.R. Harris Funeral Homes, Inc.,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - M.A.B. v. Bd. of Ed. of Talbot Cty.
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/05 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, Joanna Cifredo, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Victoria Rodriguez Roldan (Sofis, Aliki)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
36 36 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 08/30 11:52 PM
MOTION Requesting Oral Argument re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J.G., Victoria Rodriguez Roldan, Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez filed by Omar Gonzalez-Pagan on behalf of Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Victoria Rodriguez Roldan Responses due by 9/13/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Gonzalez-Pagan, Omar)
Related: [-] 26
Tuesday, August 29, 2017
35 35 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 08/29 7:48 PM
ORDER denied22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 8/29/2017. (mld)
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/29 7:47 PM
ORDER finding as moot21 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 8/29/2017. (mld)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2017
33 33 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 08/28 12:32 PM
ORDER granted retroactively30 Motion for Extension of Time. The31 opposition to plaintiffs'26 Motion for Summary Judgment filed on 7/25/2017 is authorized. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 8/24/2017. (mld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
32 32 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 08/01 11:54 AM
RESPONSE in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM filed by All Plaintiffs Re:26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J.G., Victoria Rodriguez Roldan, Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez,31 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Ricardo Rossello Nevares, Rafael Rodriguez Mercado, Wanda Llovet Diaz,28 Affidavit, filed by J.G., Victoria Rodriguez Roldan, Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez,27 Memorandum in support, filed by J.G., Victoria Rodriguez Roldan, Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez filed by All Plaintiffs.(Sofis, Aliki)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply Statement of Material Facts in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
31 31 25 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/25 3:42 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Wanda Llovet Diaz, Rafael Rodriguez Mercado, Ricardo Rossello Nevares Re:26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J.G., Victoria Rodriguez Roldan, Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez,28 Affidavit, filed by J.G., Victoria Rodriguez Roldan, Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez,27 Memorandum in support, filed by J.G., Victoria Rodriguez Roldan, Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez filed by Wanda Llovet Diaz, Rafael Rodriguez Mercado, Ricardo Rossello Nevares.(Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts
Monday, July 10, 2017
30 30 motion Extension of Time Mon 07/10 9:46 AM
MOTION for extension of time until July 25, 2017 to file Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Idza Diaz-Rivera on behalf of Wanda Llovet Diaz, Rafael Rodriguez Mercado, Ricardo Rossello Nevares Responses due by 7/24/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2017
29 29 respoth Memorandum in Opposition Mon 06/26 4:34 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Victoria Rodriguez Roldan Re:22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ricardo Rossello Nevares, Rafael Rodriguez Mercado, Wanda Llovet Diaz filed by Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Victoria Rodriguez Roldan. (Gonzalez-Pagan, Omar)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Affidavit Mon 06/26 4:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Omar Gonzalez-Pagan by Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Victoria Rodriguez Roldan. (Gonzalez-Pagan, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
27 27 respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 06/26 4:12 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Victoria Rodriguez Roldan Re:26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by J.G., Victoria Rodriguez Roldan, Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez filed by Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Victoria Rodriguez Roldan. (Gonzalez-Pagan, Omar)
Related: [-]
26 26 4 pgs motion Summary Judgment Mon 06/26 4:02 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Omar Gonzalez-Pagan on behalf of Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s, Victoria Rodriguez Roldan Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 7/10/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Gonzalez-Pagan, Omar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Statement of Material Facts,
Att: 2 Affidavit Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez,
Att: 3 Affidavit Victoria Rodriguez Roldan,
Att: 4 Affidavit J.G.,
Att: 5 Affidavit Pedro Julio Serrano Burgos,
Att: 6 30 pgs Affidavit Dr. Randi C. Ettner, Ph.D.
Thursday, June 22, 2017
25 25 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 06/22 7:22 PM
ORDER granted2 Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously and Protective Order. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 6/22/2017. (mld)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
24 24 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 06/15 7:33 PM
ORDER granted retroactively20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 6/14/2017. (mld)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 06/15 7:32 PM
ORDER granted5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice by attorneys Kara Nicole Ingelhart, Omar Gonzalez-Pagan, Demoya Gordon, M. Dru Levasseur, Bonnie C. Doyle, David C. Soutter, Sara Perkins Jones, Aliki Sofis, Daniel O'Connor and Richard D. Batchelder. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 6/14/2017. (mld)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2017
22 22 21 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 06/12 6:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Idza Diaz-Rivera on behalf of Wanda Llovet Diaz, Rafael Rodriguez Mercado, Ricardo Rossello Nevares Responses due by 6/26/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
21 21 motion Dismiss Thu 06/08 2:55 PM
MOTION to dismiss STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AS TO JOANNA CIFREDO as to All Plaintiffs filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of Joanna Cifredo Responses due by 6/22/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
20 20 motion Extension of Time Tue 05/02 10:43 AM
MOTION for extension of time until June 12, 2017 to Answer complaint or otherwise plead filed by Idza Diaz-Rivera on behalf of Wanda Llovet Diaz, Rafael Rodriguez Mercado, Ricardo Rossello Nevares Responses due by 5/16/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Rivera, Idza)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/12 3:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Wanda Llovet Diaz served on 4/12/2017, answer due 5/3/2017. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/12 3:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Rafael Rodriguez Mercado served on 4/12/2017, answer due 5/3/2017. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/12 3:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Ricardo Rossello Nevares served on 4/12/2017, answer due 5/3/2017. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/11 3:25 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement byPuerto Rico Para Tod@s. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/11 3:12 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Victoria Rodriguez Roldan, Joanna Cifredo, Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s.(Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 11:43 AM
Motion to allow Richard D Batchelder to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number prx100048823) filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 11:42 AM
Motion to allow R. Daniel O'Connor to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number prx100048823) filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 11:40 AM
Motion to allow Aliki Sofis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number prx100048823) filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 11:39 AM
Motion to allow Sara Perkins Jones to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number prx100048823) filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 11:37 AM
Motion to allow David C. Soutter to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number prx100048823) filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 11:36 AM
Motion to allow Bonnie C. Doyle to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number prx100048823) filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 11:33 AM
Motion to allow M. Dru Levasseur to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number prx100048822) filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 11:32 AM
Motion to allow Demoya Gordon to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number prx100048822) filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 11:31 AM
Motion to allow Omar Gonzalez -Pagan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number prx100048822) filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 11:29 AM
Motion to allow Kara Nicole Ingelhart to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number prx100048821) filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 4/21/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 04/07 11:04 AM
Summons Issued as to Wanda Llovet Diaz, Rafael Rodriguez Mercado, Ricardo Rossello Nevares (arg)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 04/07 8:57 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2017
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/06 3:56 PM
MOTION To Proceed Pseudonymously filed by Celina Romany-Siaca on behalf of J.G. Responses due by 4/20/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Order
1 1 46 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/06 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Wanda Llovet Diaz, Rafael Rodriguez Mercado, Ricardo Rossello Nevares ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5385231.), filed by Victoria Rodriguez Roldan, Joanna Cifredo, Daniela Arroyo Gonzalez, J.G., Puerto Rico Para Tod@s. Service due by 7/5/2017,(Romany-Siaca, Celina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons RRN,
Att: 4 Summons RRM,
Att: 5 Summons WLD