Whirlpool Corporation v. hhgregg, Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robyn L Moberly |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50104 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
hhgregg, Inc.
4151 East 96th Street
Indianapolis, IN 46240 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gregg Appliances, Inc.
4151 East 96th Street
Indianapolis, IN 46250 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
HHG Distributing LLC
4151 East 96th Street
Indianapolis, IN 46240 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
101 N Phillips Ave.
Sioux Falls, SD 57104 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
GACP Finance Co., LLC
11100 Santa Monica Blvd Ste. 800
Los Angeles, CA 90025 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hilco Merchant Resources, LLC
5 Revere Drive, No. 300
Northbrook, IL 60062 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC
800 Boylston Street 27th Floor
Boston, MA 02199 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Whirlpool Corporation
2000 N M-63
Benton Harbor, MI 49022 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
GPO
Dec 04 2017
Order Granting Wells Fargo Bank's (Deemed) Motion for Summary Judgment (re: Doc # 24). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago |
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
188 | 188
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 08/29 8:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
187 | 187
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Tue 08/22 3:37 PM
Minute Entry/Order: Continued Second video Pretrial Conference set 11/1/2023 re: Complaint1 . Continued Second video Pretrial Conference vacated per Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 8/22/2023 . (lat) |
|
186 | 186
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Tue 08/22 3:23 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Adam D Cole, Gary D Underdahl, Stephen B. Grow on behalf of Defendants Gregg Appliances, Inc., HHG Distributing LLC, hhgregg, Inc., Counterclaimant Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Plaintiff Whirlpool Corporation. (Grow, Stephen) |