New York Tire Factory Inc. v. Mavis Tire Supply LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-71375
Lead BK case is: 8:17-bk-71375
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:17-ap-08114 |
Nature of Suit | 81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 22, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Mavis Tire Supply LLC
358 Saw Mill River Road
Millwood, NY 10546 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
New York Tire Factory Inc.
25A Dubon Court
Farmingdale, NY 11735 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 11/22 9:08 AM
Adversary Case 8:17-ap-8114 Closed. (ssw) |
||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 11/22 8:47 AM
Order Granting Stipulation by and between Plaintiff and Defendant Mavis Tire Supply LLC Dismissing and Settling Agreement . Signed on 11/21/2017 (ssw) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP)
Thu 11/02 12:18 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance(s) by Michael Fox and Alfred Dimino - SETTLED - ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED (ymills) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP)
Thu 09/14 11:37 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance(s) by Lauren Irby and Michael Fox - Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/01/2017 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 760 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. (ymills) |
||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Mon 08/14 11:49 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Michael S Fox on behalf of New York Tire Factory Inc. (Fox, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Compromise Controversy
Fri 08/11 9:56 AM
Motion to Compromise Controversy / Motion for entry of an Order Authorizing and approving Stiplation of Dismissal and Settlement Agreement. . Objections to be filed on 8/31/2017 at: 4:00 p.m.. Hearing on Objections, if any, will be held on: TBD. Filed by Michael S Fox on behalf of New York Tire Factory Inc.. Order to be presented for signature on 9/7/2017. (Fox, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Fri 08/11 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 08/10/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Thu 08/10 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 08/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
Court's Certificate of Mailing
Tue 08/08 8:21 AM
Court's Service List (ymm) |
|
12 | 12
court
Court's Certificate of Mailing
Mon 08/07 10:30 AM
Court's Service List (ymm) |
|
11 | 11
court
Court's Certificate of Mailing
Mon 08/07 10:28 AM
Court's Service List (ymm) |
|
10 | 10
order
Appointing Mediator
Mon 08/07 10:28 AM
Order Assigning Matter to Mediation; that Eric Haber, Esq., is hereby designated as mediator; that Scott Mandelup, Esq., is hereby designated as alternate mediator in the event that Eric Haber, Esq. has a conflict or is otherwise unable to serve as Mediator; that the mediation shall be concluded, whether by separate or joint sessions, by September 15, 2017; the Mediator shall file a status letter as to whether the mediation resulted in a settlement by September 27, 2017 and that the pre-trial conferences scheduled on September 13, 2017 in the Adversary Proceedings shall be adjourned to October 3, 2017 at 2:00 p.m.. . Signed on 8/4/2017 (ymm) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP)
Thu 06/22 4:14 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance(s) by Michael Fox, Sean Southard, Jeffrey Herzberg, Charles Fisher, Ira Herman, Amy Williams, Brett Goodman and Alfred Dimino - Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/13/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. COURT TO ISSUE MEDIATION ORDER (ymills) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Wed 06/07 3:52 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Stephanie R Sweeney on behalf of Mavis Tire Supply LLC (Sweeney, Stephanie) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/07 1:31 PM
Answer to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers and To Disallow Claims , Answer to Complaint Filed by Stephanie R Sweeney on behalf of Mavis Tire Supply LLC (Sweeney, Stephanie) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Sat 05/27 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 05/26/2017. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Fri 05/26 3:29 PM
Letter Requesting Adjournment of Scheduling Order Deadlines Filed by Stephanie R Sweeney on behalf of Mavis Tire Supply LLC (Sweeney, Stephanie) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Adversary Scheduling Order (Judge Trust Cases Only)
Wed 05/24 1:38 PM
Initial Adversary Scheduling Order Parties are ordered to attend a conference under FRBP 7026f on or before May 31, 2017. Joint Discovery Control Plan due by 6/7/2017. Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7008a due by 6/7/2017. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/21/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 960 (Judge Trust), CI, NY. Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff New York Tire Factory Inc. Signed on 5/24/2017 (ymm) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 04/10 3:54 PM
Summons Served on Mavis Tire Supply LLC 4/7/2017 . (Fox, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Mon 04/10 9:57 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Michael S Fox on behalf of New York Tire Factory Inc. (Fox, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons In An Adversary Proceeding (Judge Trust and Judge Scarcella) (Auto)
Fri 04/07 9:33 AM
Summons In An Adversary Proceeding Issued by Clerk's Office against Mavis Tire Supply LLC Answer Due: 5/8/2017 (dhc) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/06 5:42 PM
Adversary case 8 17-08114 Complaint by New York Tire Factory Inc. against Mavis Tire Supply LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference), 14 (Recovery of money/property-other), 81 (subordination of claim or interest), 91 (Declaratory judgment)). (Fox, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet |