Vaughn Wind, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10992
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10992
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10939 |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Vaughn Wind, LLC
13736 Riverport Dr
Maryland Heights, MO 63043-4820 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago |
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 08/13 4:43 PM
Case Closed. (Ho, Amanda) |
||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order of Final Decree Authorizing Closing Of Case Signed On 8/10/2018. (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual /Statement of Financial Affairs for Vaughn Wind, LLC Filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Vaughn Wind, LLC. (Oswald, Frank) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual /Schedules of Assets and Liabilities for Vaughn Wind, LLC Filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Vaughn Wind, LLC. (Oswald, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Tue 04/25 3:07 PM
Case Joint Administration: The Docket in Case No. 16-10992 (SMB) Should Be Consulted For All Matters Affecting The Above Listed Case. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Tue 04/25 3:11 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerk LLC, added to the case. (Richards, Beverly) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
misc
Add Judge
Mon 04/10 8:53 AM
Judge Stuart M. Bernstein added to the case. (Lewis, Tenille) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Statement Notice Of Commencement Of Chapter 11 Cases And Joint Administration filed by J. Eric Ivester on behalf of Vaughn Wind, LLC. (Ivester, J.) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by J. Eric Ivester of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP on behalf of Vaughn Wind, LLC. (Ivester, J.) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 04/07 9:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10939 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11804021. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |