Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:17-bk-10943
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2017
Terminated:Aug 13, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
EchoFirst Finance Co., LLC
13736 Riverport Dr Fl 11
Maryland Heights, MO 63043-4820
Represented By
J. Eric Ivester
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Monday, August 13, 2018
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 08/13 12:03 PM
Case Closed. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
5 5 order Order, Final Decree Fri 08/10 12:23 PM
Order of Final Decree Authorizing Closing Of Case Signed On 8/10/2018. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2017
4 4 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 05/08 7:26 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual /Statement of Financial Affairs for EchoFirst Finance Co., LLC Filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of EchoFirst Finance Co., LLC. (Oswald, Frank)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Schedules Mon 05/08 7:09 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual /Schedules of Assets and Liabilities for EchoFirst Finance Co., LLC Filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of EchoFirst Finance Co., LLC. (Oswald, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Tue 04/25 3:07 PM
Case Joint Administration: The Docket in Case No. 16-10992 (SMB) Should Be Consulted For All Matters Affecting The Above Listed Case. (Richards, Beverly)
Related: [-]
misc Add Claims and Noticing Agent Tue 04/25 3:11 PM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Prime Clerk LLC, added to the case. (Richards, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
misc Add Judge Mon 04/10 8:53 AM
Judge Stuart M. Bernstein added to the case. (Lewis, Tenille)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
2 2 answer Statement Fri 04/07 10:17 PM
Statement Notice Of Commencement Of Chapter 11 Cases And Joint Administration filed by J. Eric Ivester on behalf of EchoFirst Finance Co., LLC. (Ivester, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/07 9:11 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by J. Eric Ivester of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP on behalf of EchoFirst Finance Co., LLC. (Ivester, J.)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Fri 04/07 9:53 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10943 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11804028. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1