Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Riot Games, Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Schroeder, III |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00284 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 04, 2017 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Riot Games, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Uniloc USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Thu 10/26 4:23 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) due to dismissal of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (sm, ) |
|
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 10/26 4:21 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.41(a) and all pending motions between Uniloc and Riot Games are hereby denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/26/2017. (sm, ) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Docket Correction
Thu 10/05 1:34 PM
***FILED IN ERROR PER CLERK. Document # 27, DISCOVERY ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
9
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/04 9:31 AM
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/03/2017. (nkl, ) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 09/28 3:32 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re21 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1406 Responses due by 10/2/2017. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/28/2017. (sm, ) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 09/25 8:38 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1406 by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc..(Loveless, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 09/14 9:27 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re21 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1406 Responses due by 9/26/2017. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/13/2017. (sm, ) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 09/11 8:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1406 by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc..(Loveless, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 08/29 2:42 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for leave to file under seal. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/29/2017. (sm, ) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Sealed Motion
Mon 08/28 9:37 PM
SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1406 by Riot Games, Inc..(Mann, James) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Veronica Keegan, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Sam Stake, | ||
Att: 3 1, | ||
Att: 4 2, | ||
Att: 5 3, | ||
Att: 6 4, | ||
Att: 7 5, | ||
Att: 8 6, | ||
Att: 9 7, | ||
Att: 10 8, | ||
Att: 11 9, | ||
Att: 12 10, | ||
Att: 13 11, | ||
Att: 14 12, | ||
Att: 15 13, | ||
Att: 16 14, | ||
Att: 17 15, | ||
Att: 18 16, | ||
Att: 19 17, | ||
Att: 20 18, | ||
Att: 21 19, | ||
Att: 22 20, | ||
Att: 23 21, | ||
Att: 24 22, | ||
Att: 25 23, | ||
Att: 26 24, | ||
Att: 27 25, | ||
Att: 28 26, | ||
Att: 29 27, | ||
Att: 30 28, | ||
Att: 31 Text of Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 08/28 9:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Riot Games, Inc..(Mann, James) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/28 9:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1406 by Riot Games, Inc..(Mann, James) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Veronica Keegan, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Sam Stake, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 23, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 24, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 25, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 26, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit 27, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit 28, | ||
Att: 31 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Thu 08/17 1:04 PM
***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE*** Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Riot Games, Inc..( Mann, James) Modified on 8/17/2017 (sm, ) |
|
notice
Notice of Docket Correction
Thu 08/17 1:57 PM
***FILED IN ERROR, FILED IN CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE INSTEAD OF LEAD. Document # 18, Second Application. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Wed 08/09 10:14 AM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action (2:16-cv-01316) shall serve as the lead case for the consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as lead and local counsel only. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/8/2017. (sm, ) |
|
utility
Remark
Wed 08/09 10:15 AM
ALL FUTURE PRETRIAL FILINGS, OTHER THAN VENUE MOTIONS, SHALL BE FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE 2:16cv1316 PER CONSOLIDATION ORDER. (sm, ) |
||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/04 10:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. for Riot Games, Inc.. (nkl, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 07/18 8:56 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Riot Games, Inc. (Thompson, Gregory) |
|
14 | 14
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 07/18 8:41 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Riot Games, Inc..( Mann, James) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 07/18 8:40 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Riot Games, Inc. (Mann, James) |
|
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 07/18 9:20 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Riot Games, Inc. to 8/21/2017. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order of Recusal
Mon 05/15 9:52 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/12/2017. (nkl, ) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 04/28 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Huang, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/12 9:45 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Riot Games, Inc.. (nkl, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/11 7:47 AM
Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Tue 04/11 7:47 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, ) |
||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/10 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Richins, Travis) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/10 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mangrum, Brett) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 04/10 2:20 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Loveless, Ryan) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/10 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loveless, Ryan) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Mon 04/10 2:13 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:4 Amended Complaint.. (Etheridge, James) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/10 12:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Riot Games, Inc., filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A..(Etheridge, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/07 5:09 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Etheridge, James) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
Fri 04/07 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to James L Etheridge on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Etheridge, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/07 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT of Patent Infringement against Riot Games, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6238718.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A..(Etheridge, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - '466 Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - '766 Patent, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - '578 Patent, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - '293 Patent, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |