Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michele J Kim
Case #: 2:13-bk-21371
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Nov 17, 2014
Claims Deadline:Feb 16, 2015
Converted:Oct 09, 2014
Terminated:Apr 11, 2018
Discharge Objection Deadline:Jan 16, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Eco-Safe Solutions, Inc.
326 S 5th St
Jesup, GA 31545-0323
Represented By
Joelyn W. Pirkle
contact info
None Specified
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
R. Michael Souther, Trustee
P. O. Box 978
Brunswick, GA 31521
Represented By
R. Michael Souther, Trustee
contact info
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
Johnson Square Business Center 2 East Bryan Street, Ste 725
Savannah, GA 31401
Represented By
Matthew E. Mills
Office Of The U S Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/15/2015 12:41 PM EDT
Monday, December 16, 2013
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 13-21371 [misc,volp11] (1213.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10770317. Fee amount $1213.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1213 Filed by Eco-Safe Solutions, Inc. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 10/13/2014. Disclosure Statement due by 10/13/2014. (Pirkle, Joelyn)
Related: [-]
2 2 Application to Employ Joelyn W. Pirkle as Attorney Filed by Joelyn W. Pirkle on behalf of Eco-Safe Solutions, Inc.. (Pirkle, Joelyn)
Related: [-]
3 3 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Joelyn W. Pirkle on behalf of Eco-Safe Solutions, Inc. (Creel, Renae)
Related: [-]