Republic of Texas Brands, Inc.
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barbara J Houser |
Case #: | 3:13-bk-36434 |
Case Filed: | Dec 16, 2013 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 10, 2014 |
Claims Deadline: | Apr 10, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 22, 2014 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jul 11, 2014 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Republic of Texas Brands, Inc.
3030 Lyndon B Johnson Fwy Ste 700
Dallas, TX 75234-7763 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
1. | Totally chilling out: Republic of Texas Brands is changing its name to Totally Hemp Crazy. - Bankruptcy Beat - WSJ (blogs.wsj.com) |
Submitted Fri 07/25/2014 | |
2. | Bankruptcy Disclosure Plan Accepted by the Courts, RTXBQ to Emerge From Chapter 11 in a Favorable Plan (marketwatch.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/28/2014 | |