Original Case: 3:13-cv-04065

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-15648
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2017
Terminated:Sep 15, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 1:38 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
LYFT, INC.
Represented By
Jon B. Eisenberg
Horvitz & Levy LLP
contact info
Felix Shafir
Horvitz & Levy LLP
contact info
Simona Agnolucci
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Thomas M. McInerney
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Peder Kristian Batalden
Horvitz & Levy LLP
contact info
R. James Slaughter
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Objector - Appellant
JAMES PAGE
Represented By
Caroline V. Tucker
Tucker Pollard
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PATRICK COTTER
Represented By
Matthew David Carlson
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ALEJANDRA MACIEL
Represented By
Matthew David Carlson
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JEFFREY KNUDTSON, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Matthew David Carlson
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/19/2017 1:33 AM PDT
Thursday, April 06, 2017
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/13/2017. Transcript ordered by 05/01/2017. Transcript due 05/30/2017. Appellant James Page opening brief due 07/10/2017. Appellees Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Lyft, Inc. and Alejandra Maciel answering brief due 08/10/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10387058] (RT) [Entered: 04/06/2017 03:44 PM]
Related: [-]