Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-40525

Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Edward J Coleman III
Case #: 4:17-ap-04017
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2017
Terminated:Nov 30, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Chase Bank USA, N.A.
ATTENTION: Eileen M. Serra, CEO 270 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Christopher Rivas
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.
1201 Peachtree Street, NE
Atlanta, GA 30361
Represented By
Christopher Rivas
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
James L. Drake, Jr.
James L. Drake, Jr., PC P.O. Box 9945
Savannah, GA 31412
Represented By
Shawna Y. Staton
James L. Drake, Jr., PC
contact info
James L. Drake, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, August 31, 2020
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC Auto) Mon 08/31 7:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by RC. Receipt Number 536365. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2017
38 38 court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/30 8:57 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-4017 Closed (RTC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2017
37 37 misc Stipulation Mon 11/13 2:36 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal By James L. Drake Jr. and Chase Bank USA, N.A. . Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. (Staton, Shawna) Modified on 11/13/2017 to add docket text.(Creel, Renae)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 07, 2017
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 10/08 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 10/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34
Friday, October 06, 2017
35 35 misc Withdrawal Fri 10/06 4:13 PM
Consent Withdrawal of Stipulation Filed by Abby A. Vineyard on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Vineyard, Abby)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2017
34 34 order Compromise/Settlement (Ch. 7 only)(order) Thu 10/05 12:39 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement Related [+] Filed on 10/5/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] Related Doc #30
Friday, September 29, 2017
33 33 misc Stipulation Fri 09/29 3:07 PM
Stipulation By Chase Bank USA, N.A. and James L. Drake, Jr., Trustee . Filed by Shawna Y. Staton, Abby A. Vineyard on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Vineyard, Abby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
32 32 court Deficiency Notice (RE: Proposed Order) Wed 09/06 11:32 AM
(Text Only) Deficiency Notice to Shawna Staton RE: Defective eOrder Uploaded. Your eOrder is deficient for the following reason(s): must contain the language "After notice of opportunity for hearing and motion having been served to respondent(s) and no reponse having been filed". Correct then, upload your corrected order via the eOrders module using the event under Adversary or Bankruptcy > Order Upload. Related [+]. Order due by 9/13/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] 30
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
31 31 misc Amended Certificate of Service Tue 09/05 3:57 PM
Amended Certificate of Service as to Motion for Approval of Compromise and Settlement of Controversy and Notice of Motion Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-] 30
30 30 motion Compromise/Settlement (Ch. 7 only) and Notice and Opportunity for Hearing Tue 09/05 11:27 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement and Notice and Opportunity for Hearing. Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr.. Responses due on or Before: 9/26/2017, plus an additional three days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 02, 2017
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 09/03 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 09/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28
Thursday, August 31, 2017
28 28 order Consent Order Thu 08/31 12:17 PM
Consent Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer Due 9/29/17 Filed on 8/31/2017 Related [+]. (RTC)
Related: [-] 27
Tuesday, August 29, 2017
27 27 misc Stipulation Tue 08/29 4:10 PM
Stipulation By Chase Bank USA, N.A. and James L. Drake, Jr., Trustee . Filed by Shawna Y. Staton, Abby A. Vineyard on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Vineyard, Abby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, July 30, 2017
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 07/31 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25
Thursday, July 27, 2017
25 25 order Extend Time (order) Thu 07/27 5:47 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+]. Filed on 7/27/2017. Deadline due on 8/30/2017. (CHA)
Related: [-] 24
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
24 24 misc Stipulation Wed 07/26 7:53 AM
Stipulation By Chase Bank USA, N.A. and James L. Drake, Jr., Trustee . Filed by Shawna Y. Staton, Abby A. Vineyard on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Vineyard, Abby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 07, 2017
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 07/08 1:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
22 22 order Consent Order Wed 07/05 3:19 PM
Consent Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer Due July 31, 2017 Filed on 7/5/2017 Related [+]. (CHA)
Related: [-] 15 ,21
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
21 21 misc Stipulation Wed 06/28 12:28 PM
Stipulation By Chase Bank USA, N.A. and James L. Drake, Jr., Trustee . Filed by Shawna Y. Staton, Abby A. Vineyard on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Vineyard, Abby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 26, 2017
20 20 court Returned Mail Notice (BNC) Tue 06/27 10:17 AM
Returned Mail Notice for Chase Bankcard Services, Inc. c/o CT Corporation System, Registered Agent. Attorney for Plaintiff should supply the Court with a correct address. Related [+] (RTC)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 06/15 1:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/14/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Monday, June 12, 2017
18 18 order Consent Order Mon 06/12 2:52 PM
Consent Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Answer Due June 30, 2017 Filed on 6/12/2017 Related [+]. (RTC)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
17 17 misc Stipulation Wed 06/07 8:46 AM
Stipulation By Chase Bank USA, N.A. and James L. Drake, Jr., Trustee . Filed by Shawna Y. Staton, Abby A. Vineyard on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Vineyard, Abby)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, May 21, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 05/22 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/21/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, May 19, 2017
15 15 order Consent Order Fri 05/19 11:27 AM
Consent Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Dismiss Chase Bankcard Services, Inc. Filed on 5/19/2017 Related [+]. (RTC)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
14 14 misc Proposed Order with Certificate of Service Wed 05/17 11:47 AM
Consent Proposed Order with Certificate of Service Filed by Shawna Y. Staton, Abby A. Vineyard on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A. Related [+] (Vineyard, Abby)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, May 11, 2017
13 13 court Deficiency Notice (RE: Proposed Order) Thu 05/11 12:18 PM
(Text Only) Deficiency Notice to Abby A. Vineyard RE: Failure to File and Upload a Proposed Order in eOrder Format. Pursuant to General Order 2016-2, Proposed Orders shall be submitted in an eOrder format, filed in CM/ECF with a certificate of service, and also uploaded in the eOrder module. The proposed order should address the extension of time as well as the dismissal of the defendant, Chase Bankcard Services, Inc. Please use the following event to file your proposed/consent order: Adversary or Bankruptcy > Miscellaneous > Proposed Order with Certificate of Service. Then, upload your order via the eOrders module using the event under Adversary or Bankruptcy > Order Upload. Related [+]. Order due by 5/18/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] 10
12 12 court Deficiency Notice (RE: Proposed Order) Thu 05/11 12:11 PM
(Text Only) Deficiency Notice to Shawna Y. Staton RE: Failure to File and Upload a Proposed Order in eOrder Format. Pursuant to General Order 2016-2, Proposed Orders shall be submitted in an eOrder format, filed in CM/ECF with a certificate of service, and also uploaded in the eOrder module. The proposed eOrder should address the extension of time to respond to the complaint as well as the Dismissal of Defendant, Chase Bankcard Services, Inc. Please use the following event to file your proposed/consent order: Adversary or Bankruptcy > Miscellaneous > Proposed Order with Certificate of Service. Then, upload your order via the eOrders module using the event under Adversary or Bankruptcy > Order Upload. Related [+]. Order due by 5/18/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, May 10, 2017
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Wed 05/10 3:13 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Abby L Vineyard on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Vineyard, Abby)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation Wed 05/10 3:11 PM
Stipulation By Chase Bank USA, N.A. and James L. Drake, Jr., Trustee . Filed by Shawna Y. Staton, Abby L Vineyard on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Vineyard, Abby)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2017
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Thu 04/13 2:34 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 3
8 8 misc Amended Certificate of Service Thu 04/13 11:47 AM
Amended Certificate of Service as to service of Adversary Proceeding Complaint, ReIssued Summons, Notice, and Rule 26(f) Report Format Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 3 ,5 ,6 ,7
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
7 7 misc Amended Certificate of Service Wed 04/12 4:56 PM
Amended Certificate of Service as to Adversary Proceeding Complaint, Summons, Notice, and Rule 26(f) Report Format Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 1 ,4 ,5
Monday, April 10, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/10 11:59 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
5 5 court Summons Issued/Reissued Mon 04/10 9:51 AM
ReIssued Summons and Notice Requiring Rule 26(f) Report. (RTC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued/Reissued Fri 04/07 2:56 PM
Summons and Notice Requiring Rule 26(f) Report. (RTC)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Defective Pleading (Case Mgr use only) Fri 04/07 2:53 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or Before: 4/21/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 trustee Request to Defer Payment Fri 04/07 1:58 PM
Trustee's Notice of Deferral of Filing Fee in Adversary Case Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/07 1:48 PM
Adversary case 17-04017 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by James L Drake Jr., Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake against Chase Bank USA, N.A., Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount $350 (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]