Original Case: 1:16-cv-08239

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-01000
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 06, 2017
Terminated:Aug 09, 2017
Last checked: Monday Aug 14, 2017 4:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Eric T. Schneiderman, Attorney General of the state of New York, in his official capacity
Defendant
City of New York, a municipial corporation
Defendant - Appellee
Bill de Blasio
Represented By
Zachary W. Carter
New York City Law Department
contact info
Movant - Appellant
Michelle L. McGuirk
Represented By
Michelle L. McGuirk
-
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Airbnb, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Hugh Blavin
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/14/2017 4:27 AM EDT
Thursday, April 06, 2017
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michelle L. McGuirk, FILED. [2007213] 17-1000 [Entered: 04/07/2017 03:53 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/03/2017, RECEIVED.[2007230] 17-1000 [Entered: 04/07/2017 03:59 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/05/2016, RECEIVED.[2007235] 17-1000 [Entered: 04/07/2017 04:00 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/09/2017, RECEIVED.[2007236] 17-1000 [Entered: 04/07/2017 04:01 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2007237] 17-1000 [Entered: 04/07/2017 04:01 PM]
Related: [-]