Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-40525

Georgia Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Edward J Coleman III
Case #: 4:17-ap-04018
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2017
Terminated:Nov 30, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express Bank, FSB
200 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10285
Represented By
None Specified
contact info
Plaintiff
James L. Drake, Jr.
P.O. Box 9945
Savannah, GA 31412
Represented By
Shawna Y. Staton
James L. Drake, Jr., PC
contact info
James L. Drake, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Monday, August 31, 2020
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC Auto) Mon 08/31 7:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by RC. Receipt Number 536365. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2017
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/30 10:09 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-4018 Closed (RTC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2017
25 25 misc Stipulation Mon 11/13 12:57 PM
Stipulation By James L. Drake Jr. and American Express Bank, FSB of Voluntary Dismissal . Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Withdrawal Mon 11/13 12:51 PM
Withdrawal of Voluntary Dismissal Docketed as Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-] 23
Thursday, October 26, 2017
23 23 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/26 2:32 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr.. (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 07, 2017
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 10/08 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21
Thursday, October 05, 2017
21 21 order Compromise/Settlement (Ch. 7 only)(order) Thu 10/05 12:40 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement Related [+] Filed on 10/5/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] Related Doc #16
Friday, September 08, 2017
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - No Import into CMA Sat 09/09 1:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
19 19 notice Creditors and Parties in Interest Wed 09/06 2:46 PM
Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest RE: Show Cause Hearing. Related [+]. (RTC)
Related: [-] 14
18 18 court Deficiency Notice (RE: Proposed Order) Wed 09/06 10:53 AM
(Text Only) Deficiency Notice to Shawna Staton RE: Defective eOrder Uploaded. Your eOrder is deficient for the following reason(s): must contain language "After notice of opportunity for hearing and motion having been served to respondent(s) and no response having been filed". Correct, then upload your corrected order via the eOrders module using the event under Adversary or Bankruptcy > Order Upload. Related [+]. Order due by 9/13/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] 16
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
17 17 misc Amended Certificate of Service Tue 09/05 3:48 PM
Amended Certificate of Service as to Motion for Approval of Compromise and Settlement of Controversy and Notice of Motion Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 motion Compromise/Settlement (Ch. 7 only) and Notice and Opportunity for Hearing Tue 09/05 11:06 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise/Settlement and Notice and Opportunity for Hearing. Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr.. Responses due on or Before: 9/26/2017, plus an additional three days if served by mail or otherwise allowed under FRBP 9006(f). (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2017
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/25 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/24/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
14 14 court Hearing (AP - all types) Tue 08/22 12:22 PM
Notice of SHOW CAUSE HEARINNG Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 9/21/2017 at 10:00 AM at SAVANNAH COURTHOUSE. (RTC)
Related: [-] 11 ,12
13 13 court Hearing Tue 08/22 12:17 PM
Entered in Error Incorrect form. Notice of Show Cause Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 9/21/2017 at 10:00 AM at SAVANNAH COURTHOUSE. (RTC) Modified on 8/22/2017 (Creel, Renae)
Related: [-] 11 ,12
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
12 12 misc Statement of Intent Tue 08/01 2:14 PM
Statement of Intent. to Move For Authority To Compromise Controversy Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
11 11 notice Requirement to File Rule 26(f) Report Tue 07/18 2:13 PM
Notice of Requirement to File Rule 26(f) Report Related [+]. Report due by: 8/1/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, May 10, 2017
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/11 12:19 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Don Smart on behalf of American Express Bank, FSB Related [+] (RTC)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Wed 05/10 3:16 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by Don Smart on behalf of American Express Bank, FSB (Smart, Don)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/10 3:13 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by American Express Bank, FSB. (Smart, Don)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2017
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to LR 7.1.1 Thu 04/13 3:02 PM
Local Rule 7.1.1 Disclosure Statement Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 3
6 6 misc Amended Certificate of Service Thu 04/13 2:48 PM
Amended Certificate of Service of Adversary Proceeding Complaint, Summons, Notice, and Rule 26(f) Report Format Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 1 ,4 ,5
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/11 3:38 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by James L. Drake Jr. on behalf of James L. Drake Jr. Related [+] (Drake, James)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
4 4 court Summons Issued/Reissued Tue 04/11 8:45 AM
Summons and Notice Requiring Rule 26(f) Report. (RTC)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Defective Pleading (Case Mgr use only) Tue 04/11 8:41 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]. Responses due on or Before: 4/25/2017. (RTC)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, April 10, 2017
2 2 motion Defer Fee Mon 04/10 7:19 PM
Application to Defer Fee Filed by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr.. Related [+] (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/10 7:09 PM
Adversary case 17-04018 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Shawna Y. Staton on behalf of James L. Drake Jr., American Express Bank, FSB against American Express Bank, FSB. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount $350 (Staton, Shawna)
Related: [-]