Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Referred: Justin S Anand
Case #: 1:17-cv-01290
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2017
Terminated:Sep 27, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Oct 07, 2017 6:34 AM EDT
Defendant
JDH Developers, LLC
Represented By
Meredith Riggs Guerrero
Drew Eckl & Farnham - Atl
contact info
Joseph C. Chancey
Drew Eckl & Farnham - Atl
contact info
Defendant
Harry Patel
Defendant
Regina Stevenson
Interested Party
The Inn of Villa Rica LLC
Plaintiff
Jazmon Shoemake
Represented By
Clarence Arthur Sydnor, Jr.
Sydnor Group, LLC
contact info
Tunde Ezekiel
The Ezekiel Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 27, 2017
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 09/27 11:02 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING11 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) (jkl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/27 11:03 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING10 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i) (jkl) (jkl)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/27 11:04 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand terminated from case. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/26 5:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant JDH Developers, INC with Prejudice by Jazmon Shoemake. (Sydnor, Clarence)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Tue 09/26 5:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Harry Patel and Regina Stevenson with Prejudice by Jazmon Shoemake. (Sydnor, Clarence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2017
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/21 3:48 PM
Submission of9 Order on Motion to Stay to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2017
9 9 order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 08/22 7:26 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Stay and the stay previously imposed is extended for 30 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event mediation fails, the deadline for filing the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and Initial Disclosures is September 20, 2017, and the discovery period will commence on September 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/21/17. (jpa)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Stay Mon 08/21 2:51 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay [to Extend Stay] for 30 Days by JDH Developers, LLC.(Guerrero, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
7 7 order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 07/26 10:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Stay for 30 days. In the event settlement negotiations fail, JPRD and ID are due 8/21/2017, and the discovery period will commence on 8/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 7/26/2017. (btql)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
6 6 motion Stay Tue 07/25 3:00 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 30 Days to Facilitate Potential Settlement by JDH Developers, LLC.(Guerrero, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, June 23, 2017
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 06/23 10:47 AM
Clerks Notation re5 Certificate of Interested Persons, OK per TWT. (ss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 06/21 4:20 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by JDH Developers, LLC. (Guerrero, Meredith)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/21 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Riggs Guerrero on behalf of JDH Developers, LLC (Guerrero, Meredith)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/21 3:35 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by JDH Developers, LLC. Discovery ends on 11/20/2017.(Chancey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/11 12:19 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to JDH Developers, LLC. (bnw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/11 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jazmon Shoemake. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7080518.)(bnw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet