Vegoda et al v. Student Government Association Elections Board et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Lioi |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00761 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 07, 2017 5:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
Karen Becker
|
|
Defendant
Taylor Christian
|
|
Defendant
Natalie Halavick
|
|
Defendant
Rodger Page
|
|
Defendant
Kylie Smith
|
|
Defendant
Student Government Association Elections Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chad Torres
|
|
Plaintiff
Sydney Vegoda
224 W Wood St #1B
Youngstown, OH 44502 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Dylan Edwards
Terminated: 07/25/2017
INVALID ADDRESS 224 W Wood St
Youngstown, OH 44502 |
1. | 2 YSU students file lawsuit against SGA Elections Board alleging violation of Amendment rights (wfmj.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/13/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Order: A review of the record reveals that Vegoda has failed to provide the Clerk with the required copies and service forms, and the time for complying with the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order (Doc. No.8 ) has passed. Accordingly, this case is dismissed. The Court further certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/26/2019. (O,K) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Wed 06/26 12:20 PM
Copy of10 Order mailed to Sydney Vegoda at 224 W Wood St #1B Youngstown, OH 44502 on 6/26/2019. (O,K) |
||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Returned Mail addressed to Party Sydney Vegoda at 224 W Wood St, #1B, Youngstown, OH 44502. Post Office marked envelope "Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward." Related document8 . (M,TL) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. (Doc. No.2 .) The motion of defendants Youngstown State University and Karen Becker to dismiss this action pursuant to Rule 4(m) and 12(b)(2) and (6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is granted, in part. (Doc. No.7 .) The Court dismisses Youngstown State University from this action. This action may proceed, at this time, against Karen Becker in her official capacity for prospective injunctive relief. Because plaintiff has not provided U.S. Marshal forms or copies of the amended complaint to serve the remaining defendants, the Clerk's Office cannot forward this matter to the U.S. Marshal for service. Plaintiff is therefore ordered to provide six copies of the amended complaint, and a completed U.S. Marshal form for each remaining defendant, within 30 days. Plaintiff is further ordered to send a "Notice of Compliance," with an appropriate case caption for filing, with the copies and completed forms. If plaintiff does not comply with this Order, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/3/2017. (P,J) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Fri 11/03 9:03 AM
Copy of8 Memorandum Opinion and Order mailed on 11/3/2017 to: Sydney Vegoda, 224 W. Wood Street, Apt. 1B, Youngstown, OH 44502. (P,J) |
||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Motion to dismiss , Motion to dismiss party filed by Defendant Student Government Association Elections Board. Related document(s)3 ,1 . (Marti, Todd) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Wed 07/26 8:14 AM
Copy of6 Order mailed on 7/26/2017 to: Dylan Edwards, 224 W. Wood Street, Apt. 1B, Youngstown, OH 44502; Sydney Vegoda, 224 W. Wood Street, Apt. 1B, Youngstown, OH 44502. (P,J) |
||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order: In an order dated April 20, 2017 (Doc. No.4 ), Mr. Edwards was given 30 days either to pay the filing fee - $400 - or to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Although the 30-day period has well expired, he has not paid the fee or filed an application, nor has he sought an extension to do so. Accordingly, Dylan Edwards is hereby removed as party from this case. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/25/2017. (P,J) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Returned Mail addressed to Plaintiff Dylan Edwards at 224 W. Wood Street, Youngstown, OH 44502 marked return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. Related document(s)4 . (S,L) Modified text on 5/10/2017 (D,JJ) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order : Plaintiff Dylan Edwards is ordered either to pay the filing fee of $400 or to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis; plaintiff is allowed 30 days to comply with this order; if plaintiff does not do so, he may be dismissed from this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 4/20/17.(S,AA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Thu 04/20 12:34 PM
Copy of4 Order and attachment mailed to Plaintiffs, Dylan Edwards, 224 W. Wood Street, Youngstown, OH 44502, and Sydney Vegoda, 224 W. Wood Street, #1B, Youngstown, OH 44502 on 4/20/17 (S,AA) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Amended complaint against Student Government Association Elections Board, Karen Becker, Taylor Christian, Natalie Halavick, Rodger Page, Kylie Smith, and Chad Torres. Filed by Sydney Vegoda, Dylan Edwards. (S,L) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Sydney Vegoda. (S,L) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Complaint against Student Government Association Elections Board, Karen Becker, Taylor Christian, Natalie Halavick, Rodger Page, Kylie Smith and Chad Torres. Filing fee of $400 not paid, IFP pending. Filed by Sydney Vegoda and Dylan Edwards. (S,L) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Tue 04/11 8:51 AM
Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (S,L) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/11 8:52 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (S,L) |