Texas Western District Court
Judge:Orlando L Garcia
Case #: 5:17-cv-00310
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2017
Terminated:Jul 24, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Oct 08, 2017 4:46 AM CDT
Defendant
Keith Barnes
Coach 225 Bluebonnet Road
La Vernia, TX 78121
Represented By
Clay T. Grover
Rogers, Morris & Grover, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scott Grub
Head Coach 225 Bluebonnet Road
La Vernia, TX 78121
Represented By
Clay T. Grover
Rogers, Morris & Grover, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Richard Hinojosa
Athletic Director 225 Bluebonnet Road
La Vernia, TX 78121
Represented By
Clay T. Grover
Rogers, Morris & Grover, LLP
contact info
Defendant
LaVernia ISD
13600 US Highway 87 West
La Vernia, TX 78232
Represented By
Katie E. Payne
Walsh Gallegos Trevino Russo & Kyle P.C.
contact info
Donald Craig Wood
Walsh Gallegos Trevino Russo & Kyle P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Brandon Layne
Former Athletic Director and Head Coach 1025 East 8th Street
Ferris, TX 75125
Represented By
Clay T. Grover
Rogers, Morris & Grover, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kristen Martin
Principal 225 Bluebonnet Road
La Vernia, TX 78121
Represented By
Clay T. Grover
Rogers, Morris & Grover, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chris Taber
Athletic Director 225 Bluebonnet Road
La Vernia, TX 78121
Represented By
Clay T. Grover
Rogers, Morris & Grover, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jose H. Moreno
Represented By
Katie E. Payne
Walsh Gallegos Trevino Russo & Kyle P.C.
contact info
Donald Craig Wood
Walsh Gallegos Trevino Russo & Kyle P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
John Kemmerer Ivey
Ivey Law Firm.
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe
Individually and as Next Friends of Child Doe, A Minor 15600 San Pedro Avenue Suite 100
San Antonio, TX 78232
Represented By
John Kemmerer Ivey
Ivey Law Firm.
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, July 24, 2017
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/24 7:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudicie by Jane Doe, John Doe. (Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2017
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/26 3:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/23 8:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION to Dismiss in Part for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted ,19 MOTION to Dismiss by Jane Doe, John Doe.(Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 09, 2017
20 20 motion Dismiss Tue 05/09 3:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss in Part for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by LaVernia ISD, Jose H. Moreno.(Wood, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 08, 2017
19 19 motion Dismiss Mon 05/08 1:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Keith Barnes, Scott Grub, Richard Hinojosa, Brandon Layne, Kristen Martin, Chris Taber. (Grover, Clay)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 05/01 10:11 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: LaVernia ISD answer due 5/9/2017; Kristen Martin answer due 5/9/2017. (aej)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2017
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/28 8:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Kristen Martin served on 4/8/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. (Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/28 8:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. LaVernia ISD served on 4/8/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. (Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/27 2:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Scott Grub served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. (Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/27 2:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Keith Barnes served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. (Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/27 2:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Richard Hinojosa served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. (Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/27 2:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Chris Taber served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. (Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/27 2:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Jose H. Moreno served on 4/18/2017, answer due 5/9/2017. (Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/27 2:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Brandon Layne served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017. (Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 04/12 11:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Keith Barnes. (aej)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 04/12 11:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Scott Grub. (aej)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 04/12 11:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Chris Taber. (aej)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 04/12 11:41 AM
Summons Issued as to Richard Hinojosa. (aej)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 04/12 11:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Brandon Layne. (aej)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 04/12 11:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Kristen Martin. (aej)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/12 11:36 AM
Summons Issued as to Jose H. Moreno. (aej)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/12 11:34 AM
Summons Issued as to LaVernia ISD. (aej)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/12 8:13 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by John Doe. (Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/11 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT Original ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9484358). No Summons requested at this time, filed by John Doe.(Ivey, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/12 9:26 AM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Wed 04/12 9:26 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Primomo (aej)
Related: [-]