Zingler v. Smith & Nephew Inc
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Catherine C Blake |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00952 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Smith & Nephew, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven A. Zingler
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
693 | 693
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 08/15 1:03 PM
Marginal ORDER APPROVING 4573 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.; Steven A. Zingler terminated. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/1/2023. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-00952-CCB (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
692 | 692
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/28 11:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-00952-CC |