Wright v. United States of America
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02266 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:2271 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delroy Wright
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 09/26 12:38 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 9/26/17 that this action is dismissed with prejudice without costs or fees; and that this case is closed. ( Ordered by Jalitza Poved, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 9/26/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 09/26 10:56 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/25/2017 ) *Forwarded for jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 09/25 5:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States of America (Eichenholtz, Seth) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Mon 09/25 12:34 PM
Letter advising the Court that the parties have agreed on a settlement of this action by United States of America (Eichenholtz, Seth) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 09/25 12:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery in this matter having concluded, the parties are required to file a Joint Pretrial Order using the form posted on the Court's website by 10/16/2017. The parties are to simultaneously deliver to Chambers a set of those exhibits to which objection has been made, and those portions of deposition testimony that a party intends to offer and to which the adversary objects, both as reflected in the Joint Pretrial Order, so that the Court can rule on the objections at the Final Pretrial Conference to the extent practicable. Exhibits and deposition testimony which the parties may use solely for the purposes of impeachment or rebuttal should be omitted from the Joint Pretrial Order. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/26/2017 at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/25/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 09/25 12:46 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court having been advised that this matter has settled, the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 30 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents if they are submitted within this period. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/25/2017. (Cogan, Brian) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/18 1:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by United States of America. (Eichenholtz, Seth) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Fri 06/30 11:15 AM
ORDER re:10 Letter filed by Delroy Wright. Counsel is reminded that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d)(1), disclosures and discovery requests and responses must not be filed with the Court. Counsel is ORDERED to refrain from further violations. In addition, counsel is ordered that as to all future filings: (1) letters requesting relief from the Court must be designated as "motions" on ECF; (2) any letter must include a description of its subject matter in the ECF entry line, e.g., "letter regarding medical authorizations," not simply "letter," so that the docket remains intelligible. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/30/2017 (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Thu 06/29 2:21 PM
Letter by Delroy Wright (Rameau, Amy) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/22 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Seth D. Eichenholtz on behalf of United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Eichenholtz, Seth) |
|
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Thu 06/22 11:55 AM
Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/22/2017. Both sides present. Plaintiff must serve defendant with all medical releases by 6/29/2017. All fact discovery to be completed by 9/22/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 06/06 11:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Delroy Wright. United States of America served on 6/2/2017, answer due 6/23/2017. (Rameau, Amy) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Thu 06/01 10:44 AM
Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/1/2017. Plaintiff's counsel present. Plaintiff's proof of service6 is quashed as service was ineffective. The Initial Status Conference is adjourned to 6/22/2017 at 10:30 am in Chambers 704S. Parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference at5 . In addition, plaintiff is directed to serve releases and authorizations for all medical records on defendant together with the summons and complaint. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/30 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russo on behalf of Delroy Wright (aty to be noticed) (Russo, Joseph) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Tue 05/30 11:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION by Delroy Wright (Rameau, Amy) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/18 5:57 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 6/1/2017 at 10:15 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/18/2017. (Clarke, Melonie) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 04/18 9:53 AM
Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/18 9:52 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/18 9:51 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/18 9:51 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/14 5:25 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9452054 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Delroy Wright. (Rameau, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons proposed summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet |