Romero v. JCSK USA Corp. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Vera M Scanlon |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02271 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
JCSK USA Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chang K Jang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alberto Romero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Calixto Flores
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Wed 06/20 11:13 AM
ORDER granting41 Motion for Settlement. As discussed during the 6/20/2018 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), the settlement is approved as fair and reasonable under Cheeks as stated on the record. Case is closed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/20/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 06/20 11:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Status Conference held on 6/20/2018 in Courtroom 13A South. Sara Isaacson appearing with Plaintiffs. Spanish translator Ernesto Sierra present. Diane Lee appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #10:25-10:44.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 06/20 11:14 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Settlement Agreement
Mon 06/18 12:56 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and Request for Approval of Settlement Agreement as Fair by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero (Faillace, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Billing Records | ||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 06/15 8:19 AM
ORDER granting40 Motion for Extension of Time to File. STATUS REPORT ORDER: On or before 6/18/2018, the Parties must file on ECF a joint motion for judicial approval of the proposed settlement that includes the proposed settlement agreement and a letter brief. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/15/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 06/14 2:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero. (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 06/14 11:01 AM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Status Conference originally scheduled for 6/21/2018 will be held on 6/20/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/14/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/11 10:15 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015), an in-person status conference is scheduled for June 21, 2018 at 10:30 AM before the undersigned in Courtroom 13A South. Counsel for all Parties and Plaintiff are required to attend in person. To the extent the Parties have not already done so, on or before June 14, 2018, the Parties must file on ECF a joint motion for judicial approval of the proposed settlement that includes the proposed settlement agreement and a letter brief. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/11/2018. (Pearce, Jessica) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/11 8:56 AM
ORDER granting38 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The 6/11/2018 status conference is adjourned sine die. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/11/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 06/08 4:32 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero. (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/04 12:30 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero. (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 06/04 11:13 AM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2018 will begin at 9:30 AM (not 2:15 PM) in Courtroom 13A before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/4/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/04 12:46 PM
ORDER granting joint37 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The 6/7/2018 Final Pretrial Conference is rescheduled to 6/11/2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/4/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Fri 05/18 3:44 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 05/15 4:18 PM
ANSWER to28 Amended Complaint by JCSK USA Corp., Chang K Jang, Peter Shin. (Lee, Diane) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 05/08 12:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Settlement Conference held on 5/8/2018; settlement was not reached. See annexed minutes for further details. (Pohorelsky, Viktor) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 04/25 10:13 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky: Telephone Conference held on 4/25/2018. Settlement conference scheduled for May 8, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. See annexed minutes for further details. (Pohorelsky, Viktor) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/23 1:40 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky for a continued settlement conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/23/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/23 5:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 4/25/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky. The conference will address scheduling and other preparations for reopening the settlement conference. Counsel are directed to confer and cooperate in making arrangements for the conference call and shall telephone the court at (718) 804-2721 when all counsel are on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 4/23/2018. (Pohorelsky, Viktor) |
||
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Thu 04/12 9:10 AM
ORDER granting consent32 Motion to Adjourn Conference. At the request of the parties, the 4/17/2018 Status Conference is rescheduled to 4/20/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/12/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 04/11 1:42 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero. (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/03 3:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 4/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon to discuss dispositive motion practice and/or a pre-trial schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/3/2018. (Miller, Hannah) |
||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Letter
Fri 03/30 4:03 PM
Letter Motion by JCSK USA Corp., Chang K Jang, Peter Shin (Lee, Diane) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Letter
Fri 03/30 2:33 PM
Letter by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 02/28 2:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero. JCSK USA Corp. waiver sent on 2/28/2018, answer due 4/30/2018; Chang K Jang waiver sent on 2/28/2018, answer due 4/30/2018; Peter Shin waiver sent on 2/28/2018, answer due 4/30/2018. (Faillace, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 02/09 5:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JCSK USA Corp., Chang K Jang, filed by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero. (Faillace, Michael) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/08 3:16 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 2/8/2018 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery must be completed by 3/30/2018. On or before 3/30/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 5/18/2018, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. Motions in limine due on 6/1/2018. Opposition to motions due on 6/7/2018. A Pretrial Conference is set for 6/7/2018 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Voir Dire/Jury Instructions due on 6/15/2018. A Jury Trial is set for 6/25/2018 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to coordinate translators for any witnesses who will not testify in English. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/8/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 02/08 12:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Status Conference held on 2/8/2018 in Courtroom 13A South. Sara Jacqueline Isaacson appearing for Plaintiff. Diane Hwakyung Lee appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #12:00-12:14.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Amend/Correct/Supplement
Wed 02/07 4:45 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement14 Amended Complaint by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero. (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Thu 02/01 4:12 PM
Letter Joint Status Report Letter by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 11/29 2:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Settlement Conference held on 11/29/2017; settlement discussions did not produce a settlement. See annexed minutes for further details. (Pohorelsky, Viktor) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 10/17 10:25 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky:Telephone Conference held on 10/6/2017. See annexed conference minute for details. (Pohorelsky, Viktor) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 10/17 10:30 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Adjourn Conference: the settlement conference is adjourned to November 29, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. By the close of business on November 22, 2017, counsel shall each submit to the court, ex parte, a letter limited to three pages setting forth their respective settlement positions. (Chambers e-mail: viktor_pohorelsky@nyed.uscourts.gov). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 10/17/2017. (Pohorelsky, Viktor) |
||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 10/16 10:45 AM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by JCSK USA Corp., Chang K Jang. (Lee, Diane) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 10/10 9:42 AM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by JCSK USA Corp., Chang K Jang. (Lee, Diane) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 09/28 7:51 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/6/2017 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky. The conference will address scheduling and other preparations for a settlement conference. Counsel shall cooperate in making the arrangements for the telephone conference and call the court at 718-804-2721 once all participants are on the line. If the above time is not convenient for any of the participants, counsel should consult with each other and propose alternate times for the conference during the following week. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Viktor V. Pohorelsky on 9/28/2017. (Pohorelsky, Viktor) |
||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 09/27 2:46 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 9/27/2017 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery including fact discovery must be completed by 2/28/2018. On or before 2/28/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 3/9/2018, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 3/30/2018, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. An in person Status Conference is set for 2/8/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 2/1/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. The parties seek a settlement conference either before MJ Scanlon or MJ Pohorelsky. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/27/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Wed 09/27 12:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/27/2017 in Courtroom 13A. Sara Jacqueline Isaacson appearing for Plaintiff. Diane Hwakyung Lee appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #12:08-12:20.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 09/20 9:28 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 08/14 11:03 AM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Initial Conference originally scheduled for 8/24/2017 will be held on 9/27/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. The Parties are to refer to8 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 9/21/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/14/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/02 11:27 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Carol Bagley Amon no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Fernandez, Erica) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred
Wed 08/02 11:12 AM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. (Fernandez, Erica) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 07/11 9:56 AM
ORDER granting consent17 Motion to Adjourn Conference. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the Initial Conference currently scheduled for 7/20/2017 has been rescheduled to 8/23/2017 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/11/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 07/10 12:10 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero. (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
16 | 16
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 07/10 11:02 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Calixto Flores, Alberto Romero. JCSK USA Corp. waiver sent on 6/23/2017, answer due 8/22/2017; Chang K Jang waiver sent on 6/23/2017, answer due 8/22/2017. (Faillace, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Consent to Become Party (Collective Action)
Fri 06/23 11:02 AM
CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Calixto Flores (Faillace, Michael) |
|
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/23 10:49 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JCSK USA Corp., Chang K Jang, filed by Alberto Romero. (Faillace, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 06/22 10:01 AM
ORDER granting consent13 Motion to Adjourn Conference. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the Initial Conference currently scheduled for 7/7/2017 has been rescheduled to 7/20/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/22/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 06/21 9:12 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by JCSK USA Corp., Chang K Jang. (Lee, Diane) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 06/19 2:39 PM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Initial Conference originally scheduled for 6/29/2017 will be held on 7/7/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/19/2017 (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 06/09 8:40 AM
ORDER granting consent10 Motion to Adjourn Conference. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the Initial Conference currently scheduled for 6/14/2017 has been rescheduled to 6/29/2017 at 4:15 PM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/9/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 06/08 11:37 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Alberto Romero. (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Case Management Statement
Thu 06/08 11:35 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 06/08 9:58 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by JCSK USA Corp., Chang K Jang. (Lee, Diane) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/06 6:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Jacqueline Isaacson on behalf of Alberto Romero (aty to be noticed) (Isaacson, Sara) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 05/30 9:26 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 6/14/2017 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 504 North. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. In order to facilitate settlement discussions, Plaintiff's counsel is expected to provide Defendants' counsel with a detailed calculation of damages at least one week prior to the Initial Conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 6/8/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/30/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/26 2:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by JCSK USA Corp., Chang K Jang. (Lee, Diane) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/16 10:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alberto Romero. Chang K Jang served on 5/9/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. (Faillace, Michael) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/11 12:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alberto Romero. JCSK USA Corp. served on 5/5/2017, answer due 5/26/2017. (Faillace, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/18 12:22 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/18 12:21 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/18 12:21 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Jang summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/14 6:40 PM
COMPLAINT against JCSK USA Corp., Chang K Jang filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9452158 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Alberto Romero. (Faillace, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/18 12:14 PM
Case assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |