BSG Resources (Guinea) Limited et al v. Soros et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John F Keenan |
Referred: | Ona T Wang |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02726 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 27, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 11, 2017 5:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
Open Society Foundations
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
George Soros
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Foundation to Promote Open Society
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Open Society Foundation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Open Society Fund, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Open Society Institute
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Open Society Policy Center
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Natural Resource Governance Institute
|
|
Plaintiff
BSG Resources (Guinea) Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BSG Resources (Guinea) Sarl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BSG Resources Limited
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
320 | 320
1
pgs
misc
Letter
Wed 10/27 3:02 PM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Benjamin P. McCallen dated October 27, 2021 re: Notice of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Foundation to Promote Open Society, Open Society Foundation, Inc., Open Society Foundations, Open Society Fund, Inc., Open Society Institute, Open Society Policy Center, George Soros..(McCallen, Benjamin) |
|
319 | 319
2
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/27 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Defendants' Motion for Sanctions re:296 MOTION for Sanctions .. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Foundation to Promote Open Society, Open Society Foundation, Inc., Open Society Foundations, Open Society Fund, Inc., Open Society Institute, Open Society Policy Center, George Soros..(McCallen, Benjamin) |
|
318 | 318
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Wed 10/27 12:05 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice of the above-captioned case filed by the Plaintiffs BSG Resources (Guinea) Limited, BSG Resources (Guinea) Sarl, and BSG Resources Limited (in administration), and signed by the Defendants George Soros, Open Society Foundations, Open Society Institute, Foundations to Promote Open Society, Open Society Foundation, Inc., Alliance for Open Society International Inc., Open Society Policy Center, and Open Society Fund. In light of the Plaintiffs' stipulation pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.41(a)(1)(ii), it is: ORDERED that all claims asserted by Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case are dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that each party is to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/27/2021) (tg) Modified on 10/27/2021 (tg) |
|
317 | 317
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/27 11:54 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l), Plaintiffs BSG Resources (Guinea) Limited, BSG Resources (Guinea) Sari, and BSG Resources Limited (in administration), on the one hand, and Defendants George Soros, Open Society Foundations, Open Society Institute, Foundations to Promote Open Society, Open Society Foundation, Inc., Alliance for Open Society International Inc., Open Society Policy Center, and Open Society Fund, on the other hand, by their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate and agree that the above action be dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs, attorneys' fees and expenses. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts, and by facsimile, each of which shall constitute an original, but all of which taken together shall constitute one and the same instrument. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 10/27/2021) (tg) |
|
utility
Case Stay Lifted
Wed 10/27 11:55 AM
Case Stay Lifted. (tg) |
||
order
Order
Wed 10/27 2:22 PM
ORDER canceling conference . In light of the closure of this case, tomorrow's status conference is canceled. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (Wang, Ona) |
||
Monday, October 25, 2021 | ||
316 | 316
misc
Proposed Stipulation and Order
Mon 10/25 6:31 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by BSG Resources (Guinea) Limited, BSG Resources (Guinea) Sarl, BSG Resources Limited..(Solomon, Louis) |
|
315 | 315
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 10/25 4:54 PM
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by BSG Resources Limited, BSG Resources (Guinea) Sarl, BSG Resources (Guinea) Limited. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Solomon, Louis) Modified on 10/25/2021 (km) |
|
314 | 314
misc
Letter
Mon 10/25 4:47 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge John F. Keenan from Louis M. Solomon dated October 25, 2021 re: ECF 313 / LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Louis M. Solomon dated October 25, 2021 re: ECF 313. Document filed by BSG Resources (Guinea) Limited, BSG Resources (Guinea) Sarl, BSG Resources Limited..(Solomon, Louis) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
Mon 10/25 4:58 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Louis Solomon to RE-FILE Document 315 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Use the event type proposed orders, proposed stipulation and order. The document needs to have handwritten signatures of the parties. (km) |
||
Wednesday, October 20, 2021 | ||
313 | 313
1
pgs
order
Memo Endorsement
Wed 10/20 3:10 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:312 Letter filed by BSG Resources (Guinea) Sarl, BSG Resources Limited, BSG Resources (Guinea) Limited. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED: Application GRANTED. The parties are directed to file the stipulation of dismissal by 5:00 PM on Monday, October 25, 2021. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/20/2021) (rro) |