Lance v. United States of America
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | David C Norton |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00963 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1346 Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 4:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacquelyn Y Lance
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Tue 06/19 11:03 AM
ORDER approving wrongful death and survival settlement Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/19/18.(cmur, ) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Settlement
Tue 06/19 11:01 AM
PETITION for approval of wrongful death and survival action by Jacquelyn Y Lance. (cmur, ) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Tue 06/19 11:00 AM
STIPULATION for compromise settlement and release of Federal Tort Claim Act claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2677 by Jacquelyn Y Lance, United States of America. (cmur, ) |
|
25 | 25
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 06/19 10:52 AM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable David C Norton: Settlement Conference held on 6/19/2018. Parties agree on the terms of the settlement. The Court approves the settlement. Court Reporter Tana Hess. (cmur, ) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 05/25 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for Tuesday, 6/19/2018 at 10:30 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, ) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Thu 03/29 12:32 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable David C Norton. Judge Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy no longer assigned to the case. (glev, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 02/13 5:00 PM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/23/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/21/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/21/2018, Discovery due by 12/2/2018, Motion in Limine due by 2/10/2019, Motions due by 1/7/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/20/2019, Bench Trial Deadline 3/4/2019, Mediation Due by 2/6/2019. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 2/13/18. (chub, ) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 02/13 2:12 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct15 Scheduling Order,, by Jacquelyn Y Lance. Response to Motion due by 2/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bell, James) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Protective Order
Mon 02/05 11:19 AM
PROTECTION ORDER granting attorney Matthew J. Modica protection from court appearances for the dates February 13, 2018 through February 26, 2018. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 02/05/2018. (egra, ) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Fri 02/02 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Matthew J Modica for Tuesday, February 13, 2018 through Monday, February 26, 2018 (Modica, Matthew) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Protective Order
Mon 11/27 1:56 PM
PROTECTION ORDER granting attorney Matthew Modica protection from court appearances for the dates December 22, 2017 through January 8, 2018. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 11/27/2017. (egra, ) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Mon 11/27 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Matthew J Modica for Friday, December 22, 2017, through Monday, January 8, 2018 (Modica, Matthew) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/28 5:32 PM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/28/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/23/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/21/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/21/2018, Discovery due by 5/22/2018, Motion in Limine due by 8/10/2018, Motions due by 6/5/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/20/2018, Bench Trial Deadline 9/3/2018, Mediation Due by 8/6/2018. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 8/28/17. (chub, ) |
|
14 | 14
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 08/28 2:41 PM
JOINT Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Jacquelyn Y Lance.(Bell, James) |
|
13 | 13
discov
Rule 26 Discovery Plan
Mon 08/28 2:40 PM
JOINT Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Jacquelyn Y Lance.(Bell, James) |
|
12 | 12
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 08/28 2:38 PM
Rule 26(f) Report by Jacquelyn Y Lance.(Bell, James) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 07/25 4:43 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America. (Modica, Matthew) (egra, ) Refiled attachment in dkt entry9 as separate filing (egra, ) |
|
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/24 1:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/14/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/28/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 8/28/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/22/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/23/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/21/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/21/2017, Discovery due by 1/22/2018, Motion in Limine due by 4/10/2018, Motions due by 2/5/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/20/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 4/26/2018, Bench Trial Deadline 5/1/2018, Mediation Due by 4/5/2018. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 7/24/17. (chub, ) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/24 1:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by United States of America.(Modica, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 LR 26.01 Answers | ||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Protective Order
Mon 07/17 8:21 AM
PROTECTION ORDER granting attorney Matthew Modica protection from court appearances for the dates Monday, July 31, 2017 through Friday, August 4, 2017. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 07/17/2017. (egra, ) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Fri 07/14 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Matthew J Modica for Monday, July 31, through Friday, August 4, 2017. (Modica, Matthew) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 06/19 4:41 PM
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ordered that the Answer to the Complaint presently due on June 23, 2017 is hereby extended 30 days until July 24, 2017. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 06/19/2017. (egra, ) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 06/19 4:00 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to answer complaint by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 7/3/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Modica, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 04/14 9:23 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jacquelyn Y Lance. (egra, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 04/14 9:21 AM
Summons Issued as to United States of America. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (egra, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons - US Attorney | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/14 9:20 AM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7102329.), filed by Jacquelyn Y Lance. Service due by 7/12/2017 (egra, ) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of expert witness in medical malpractice case |