Original Case: 3:13-cv-04065

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv-15724
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2017
Terminated:Jun 05, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 07, 2017 1:35 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
LYFT, INC.
Represented By
Peder Kristian Batalden
Horvitz & Levy LLP
contact info
Thomas M. McInerney
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Simona Agnolucci
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Felix Shafir
Horvitz & Levy LLP
contact info
Jon B. Eisenberg
Horvitz & Levy LLP
contact info
R. James Slaughter
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Objector - Appellant
KERRY ANN SWEENEY
Represented By
Kerry Ann Sweeney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PATRICK COTTER
Represented By
Matthew David Carlson
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ALEJANDRA MACIEL
Represented By
Matthew David Carlson
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JEFFREY KNUDTSON, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Matthew David Carlson
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/07/2017 1:30 AM PDT
Thursday, April 13, 2017
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 05/11/2017. Transcript due 06/12/2017. Appellant Kerry Ann Sweeney opening brief due 07/20/2017. Appellees Patrick Cotter, Jeffrey Knudtson, Lyft, Inc. and Alejandra Maciel answering brief due 08/21/2017. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10394794] (RT) [Entered: 04/13/2017 11:31 AM]
Related: [-]