Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03181
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 14, 2017
Terminated:Sep 12, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Northside Medical Professionals, P.C.
Represented By
Northside Medical Professionals, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, September 12, 2019
9 9 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 09/12 8:03 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 09/11 11:03 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/11 11:02 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2017
6 6 answer None Mon 09/18 9:40 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Joseph E.H. Atkinson of Hancock, Daniel, Johnson, and Nagle on behalf of Northside Medical Professionals, P.C.. (Atkinson, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 8:20 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/17 3:57 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Order
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Mon 04/17 10:30 AM
Summons and notice issued to Northside Medical Professionals, P.C. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, April 14, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 04/14 7:07 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03181 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26049421, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 04/14 5:36 PM
Adversary case 17-03181 Complaint against Northside Medical Professionals, P.C. filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2