Mezebish et al v. United Bank, Inc.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Jarrod Hazel |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-01056 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 5:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
United Bank, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David S. Mezebish
2417 SAPLING RIDGE LANE
BROOKEVILLE, MD 20833 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa M. Mezebish
2417 SAPLING RIDGE LANE
BROOKEVILLE, MD 20833 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Fri 02/23 2:48 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving23 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Theresa M. Mezebish, David S. Mezebish. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 2/23/2018. (am2s, Chambers) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 02/23 12:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Consent by David S. Mezebish, Theresa M. Mezebish(Kurland, Sari) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Thu 02/22 4:26 PM
STATUS REPORT By Consent by David S. Mezebish, Theresa M. Mezebish(Kurland, Sari) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order
Thu 02/22 9:46 AM
Paperless Order: The Parties are directed to submit a status report by Monday, February 26, 2018 either informing the Court that an order pursuant to Local Rule 111 may be issued by the Court or providing a date certain by which a stipulation of dismissal will be filed.. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 2/22/2018. (am2s, Chambers) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Thu 12/28 4:27 PM
STATUS REPORT by Consent by David S. Mezebish, Theresa M. Mezebish(Kurland, Sari) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Wed 12/20 10:59 AM
Paperless ORDER: Parties shall submit a status report updating the Court on the status of settlement discussions within 10 days of this Order.. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/20/2017. (Hazel, George) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Thu 11/09 12:44 PM
STATUS REPORT FILED JOINTLY by United Bank, Inc.(Sherman, William) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Tue 10/10 10:29 AM
CORRECTED order re 16 Order on Motion to Continue, granting14 Motion to Continue. The motions hearing set for October 20, 2017 has been cancelled. The parties are directed to file a joint status report regarding settlement on or before November 9, 2017.. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/10/2017. (am2s, Chambers) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 10/10 10:17 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Motion to Continue. The motions hearing set for October 24, 2017 has been cancelled. The parties are directed to file a joint status report regarding settlement on or before November 9, 2017. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/10/2017. (am2s, Chambers) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Supplemental
Fri 10/06 12:53 PM
Supplemental to14 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss filed by United Bank, Inc. Proposed Order (Sherman, William) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Continue
Fri 10/06 11:20 AM
MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss by United Bank, Inc.(Sherman, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 09/13 1:17 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2017 is RESCHEDULED for 10/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, 6500 Cherrywood Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland 20770, before Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (am2s, Chambers) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 07/28 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A, 6500 Cherrywood Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland 20770, before Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (am2s, Chambers) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 06/22 11:46 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United Bank, Inc..(Sherman, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Response in Opposition
Thu 06/08 4:50 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss by David S. Mezebish, Theresa M. Mezebish.(Kurland, Sari) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Thu 05/25 3:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by United Bank, Inc.(Sherman, William) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/25 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William A Sherman, II on behalf of United Bank, Inc. (Sherman, William) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/03 2:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David S. Mezebish, Theresa M. Mezebish. United Bank, Inc. served on 4/21/2017, answer due 5/12/2017.(Kurland, Sari) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/25 12:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David S. Mezebish, Theresa M. Mezebish. United Bank, Inc. served on 4/20/2017, answer due 5/11/2017.(Kurland, Sari) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/19 2:07 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to United Bank, Inc.(kns, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/18 11:31 AM
NOTICE by David S. Mezebish, Theresa M. Mezebish re1 Complaint, Proposed Summons United Bank Registered Agent (Kurland, Sari) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/18 11:30 AM
NOTICE by David S. Mezebish, Theresa M. Mezebish re1 Complaint, Proposed Summons United Bank President (Kurland, Sari) |
|
2 | 2
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 04/18 11:13 AM
QC NOTICE regarding:1 Complaint, filed by Theresa M. Mezebish, David S. Mezebish. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - proposed summons. To correct this problem, file proposed summons using the event Notice (Other) and link proposed summons to 1 Complaint. (kns, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/17 6:56 PM
COMPLAINT against United Bank (WVA) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6611105.), filed by David S. Mezebish, Theresa M. Mezebish.(Kurland, Sari) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Email and Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B: Maryland Settlement Statement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C: West VA Settlement Statement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D: Mortgage Interest Statement, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E: 2015 Appraisal |