Brosnahan v. Messerli & Kramer PA
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Stadtmueller |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00542 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 5:05 AM CDT |
Defendant
Messerli & Kramer PA
|
|
Plaintiff
Lee Brosnahan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/24 4:03 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/24/2017: ADOPTING3 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Mon 07/24 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Lee Brosnahan. (Pagel, Briane) Modified on 7/24/2017 (asc) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Thu 07/20 11:35 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/20/2017. Within 14 days, Plaintiff to provide evidence of service as to Defendant or explain why good cause exists to extend the Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) service deadline. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/17 12:14 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Messerli & Kramer, P.A. by Lee Brosnahan. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2559909)(Pagel, Briane) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Summons Requested for Defendant - Messerli & Kramer, P.A., | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 04/17 12:16 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) |
||
misc
Case Opening Modification
Mon 04/17 3:03 PM
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] , the[LINK:summons instructions] and the[LINK:party name guidelines found in the user manual] for further guidance (kah) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/17 3:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Messerli & Kramer, P.A.. (kah) |