Gidarisingh v. Moungey
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lynn Adelman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00544 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
79 | 79
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to clarify
Fri 08/25 3:30 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/24/2023 DENYING75 Motion to clarify. (cc: all counsel and copy mailed to plaintiff)(amh) |