Betters v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Catherine C Blake |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01044 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2017 4:15 AM EDT |
Defendant
Smith & Nephew Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Betters
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
692 | 692
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 04/11 8:56 AM
MARGINAL ORDER Approving 5371 Stipulation of Dismissal (691 in 1:17-cv-01044-CCB, 5371 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Smith & Nephew Inc., Richard Betters (CCB 17-1044 and Richard Betters terminated. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/10/2024. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01044-CCB(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
691 | 691
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 04/09 5:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Smith & Nephew Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB, 1:17-cv-01044-CC |