Avery v. Commissioner, Social Security
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | James K Bredar |
Referred: | Stephanie A Gallagher |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01064 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Defendant
Commissioner, Social Security
|
|
Interested Party
SSA Notify
|
|
Plaintiff
Charlene H. Avery
|
Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago |
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 04/10 8:31 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Commissioner of Social Security on 5/3/2017.(aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 04/10 8:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA served on 5/4/2017, answer due 7/3/2017.(aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 12/19 3:06 PM
ORDER Granting13 Motion for Summary Judgment; Adopting Report and Recommendations re15 Report and Recommendations; Affirming the Commissioner's Judgment.. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 12/19/2017. (c/m 12/18/17 bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 11/28 3:24 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commissioner, Social Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 11/28/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Rule 12/56
Wed 10/25 1:43 PM
Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Charlene H. Avery (c/m 10/25/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 10/25 12:56 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commissioner, Social Security.(Prevas, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/29 2:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/29/2017. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 6/29/17-das) |
|
11 | 11
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/29 9:20 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner, Social Security re10 Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order,9 Transcript (Prevas, Benjamin) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order
Thu 06/29 9:18 AM
Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order submitted by Commissioner, Social Security(Prevas, Benjamin) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Transcript
Thu 06/29 9:16 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Prevas, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/08 8:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin B Prevas on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security(Prevas, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 05/15 9:04 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service as to Attorney General on 5/8/17(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/10 1:44 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Nancy Berryhill. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 04/24 12:01 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Commissioner, Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/24 10:59 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion of plaintiff for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 4/20/2017. (c/m 4/24/17 jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/19 8:03 AM
Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge James K. Bredar on 4/19/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/18 3:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlene H. Avery.(slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security, filed by Charlene H. Avery.(slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |