Blueline Rental LLC v. Lather Construction Inc et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick Michael Duffy |
Case #: | 9:17-cv-00984 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 5:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
Shawn Lather
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lather Construction Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blueline Rental LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Judgment
Wed 05/02 3:45 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of BlueLine against Lather Construction, Inc., pursuant to the terms outlined in the final Order. (egra, ) |
|
29 | 29
order
Stipulation and Order
Wed 05/02 3:36 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Final judgment is hereby entered on the claims and causes of action set forth in BlueLines Complaint in favor of BlueLine against Lather Construction, Inc., pursuant to the terms of this Order. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 05/02/2018. (egra, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/01 2:21 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 28 Reason: Proposed order was e-mailed to Chambers. (egra, ) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Reply Not to a Motion
Thu 11/16 3:59 PM
REPLY by Shawn Lather, Lather Construction Inc . (Weathers, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 11/13 11:09 AM
SECOND CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/15/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/15/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/20/2018, Discovery due by 4/20/2018, Motion in Limine due by 6/18/2018, Motions due by 5/19/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/8/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/11/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 6/18/2018, Mediation Due by 6/1/2018. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 11/13/17. (chub, ) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 11/10 10:17 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct14 Scheduling Order,, and for Entry of a Second Consent Amended Scheduling Order, by Blueline Rental LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Gilsenan, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 11/08 4:24 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct14 Scheduling Order,, and to issue a Second Amended Scheduling Order, by Blueline Rental LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/22/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Gilsenan, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
misc
Reply Not to a Motion
Wed 11/08 1:21 PM
REPLY by Blueline Rental LLC to21 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment . (Gilsenan, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 11/07 11:44 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on November 7, 2017.(jmcg, ) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 10/05 1:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Blueline Rental LLC.(Gilsenan, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents - Supplemental Declaration of Phillip Wright with exhibits E & F, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents - Declaration of Ryan Gilsenan with exhibits 1 & 2 | ||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 09/28 1:16 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Shawn Lather, Lather Construction Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/5/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Weathers, Jeffrey) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 09/28 2:11 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Shawn Lather, Lather Construction Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/5/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Weathers, Jeffrey) (egra, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/13 1:31 PM
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time of 15 days to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment.( Response to Motion due by 9/28/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 9/13/17. (cper, ) (cper, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 09/12 8:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Shawn Lather, Lather Construction Inc. Response to Motion due by 9/26/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Weathers, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 08/30 4:42 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Blueline Rental LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/13/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Gilsenan, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Phillip Wright, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - BlueLine's Requests for Admission, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Email correspondence | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/19 4:27 PM
FIRST CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/30/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/31/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/2/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/15/2017, Discovery due by 12/15/2017, Motion in Limine due by 1/30/2018, Motions due by 1/30/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/20/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 2/23/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 3/1/2018, Mediation Due by 2/15/2018. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 6/19/17. (chub, ) |
|
13 | 13
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 06/19 4:00 PM
Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Blueline Rental LLC.(Gilsenan, Ryan) |
|
12 | 12
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 06/19 3:58 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Blueline Rental LLC.(Gilsenan, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order First Consent Amended Scheduling Order | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/15 2:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/5/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/19/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 6/19/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/7/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/7/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/5/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/5/2017, Discovery due by 11/6/2017, Motion in Limine due by 2/8/2018, Motions due by 11/20/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 2/2/2018, Pretrial Briefs due by 2/23/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 3/1/2018, Mediation Due by 1/18/2018. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 5/15/17. (chub, ) |
|
Sunday, May 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 05/08 9:37 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lather Construction Inc. (Weathers, Jeffrey)(egra, ) |
|
9 | 9
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 05/08 9:36 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Shawn Lather. (Weathers, Jeffrey) (egra, ) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Sun 05/07 5:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Lather Construction Inc.(Weathers, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/8/2017 to file attachment as separate entry10 (egra, ) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Sun 05/07 5:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Shawn Lather.(Weathers, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/8/2017 to file attachment as separate entry9 (egra, ) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/01 5:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blueline Rental LLC. Shawn Lather served on 4/24/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. (Gilsenan, Ryan) (egra, ) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/01 5:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blueline Rental LLC. Lather Construction Inc served on 4/24/2017, answer due 5/15/2017. (Gilsenan, Ryan) (egra, ) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 04/18 8:57 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Blueline Rental LLC. (egra, ) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/18 8:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Shawn Lather, Lather Construction Inc. (egra, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons - Shawn Lather | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/18 8:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Shawn Lather, Lather Construction Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7105317.), filed by Blueline Rental LLC. Service due by 7/17/2017. (egra, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Rental Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - invoice |