Marson v. City of Milwaukee et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lynn Adelman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00545 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 14, 2017 5:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
Judge Carl Ashley
|
|
Defendant
City of Milwaukee
|
|
Defendant
Sheila Hill-Roberts
|
|
Defendant
Sharon Kaski
|
|
Defendant
Judge Mary Kuhnmuench
|
|
Defendant
Jessica Marquez-Murphy
|
|
Defendant
Jason Mishelow
|
|
Defendant
Allen Silverstein
|
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Marson
3501 N 42nd Street
Milwaukee, WI 53216 |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment
Thu 04/27 2:49 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/27/17. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff)(gc) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Thu 04/27 2:45 PM
DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/27/17 that the plaintiff's motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (gc) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Tue 04/18 9:54 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Sarah Marson. (jcl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Pro Se
Tue 04/18 9:53 AM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sarah Marson. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Joseph. Jury Demand (jcl) |