Linn Operating, Inc. v. TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-60040
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-60040
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 6:17-ap-06003 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Jay W. Hurst c/o Office of the Attorney General Bankruptcy - Collections Division MC-008 PO Box 12548
AUSTIN, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linn Operating, Inc.
Jackson Walker LLP 1401 McKinney Street Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
trustee
Remark (batch)
Tue 10/17 5:17 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/20 12:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/19/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Tue 04/17 3:12 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case 6:17-ap-6003 Signed on 4/17/2018 (aalo) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 02/26 3:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
court
Certificate of Notice
Fri 02/23 3:27 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. The parties have contacted the Court and have indicated that they have settled this case. Agreed order to be uploaded. . (aalo) |
||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice
Thu 02/08 9:22 AM
Notice of Reset Scheduling Conference . Filed by Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
court
Certificate of Notice
Thu 02/08 8:49 AM
Certificate of Email Notice. By agreement of all parties, the scheduling conference set for 2/9/2018 at 10:00 AM has been adjourned. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court Hearing rescheduled for 2/26/2018 at 10:15 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
||
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice
Thu 01/25 4:13 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Scheduling Conference . Filed by Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
court
Certificate of Notice
Thu 01/25 1:35 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. By agreement of all parties, the scheduling conference has been adjourned. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court . Hearing scheduled for 2/9/2018 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 01/25 12:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/24/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Mon 01/22 10:49 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to24 Transcript. Parties notified (hcar) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
30+
pgs
court
Transcript
Fri 01/19 9:16 AM
Transcript RE: Scheduling Conference held on January 10, 2018 before Judge David R. Jones. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 04/19/2018. (mhen) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 01/13 12:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/12/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 01/10 1:17 PM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Complaint, Adversary Proceeding 6:17-ap-6003 Signed on 1/10/2018. (LinhthuDo) |
|
21 | 21
court
Courtroom Minutes (CM)
Wed 01/10 11:30 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:33 am. Appearances: Patricia B Tomasco and Matthew D Cavenaugh, by phone, for the Reorganized Linn Debtors and the Reorganized Berry Debtors, Jay W Hurst for the Texas Comptroller; Client Representative: Rachel R Obaldo, Deputy Chief, Bankruptcy & Collections Division. All pending discovery and depositions abated effective today 1/10/2018. Scheduling conference continued to 1/26/2018 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (LinhthuDo) |
|
Saturday, December 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 12/16 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/16/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Thu 12/14 11:07 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to17 Transcript. Parties notified (dhan) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Proposed Order Submission After Hearing (Greensheet)
Wed 12/13 5:46 PM
Proposed Order Submission After Hearing (Filed By Linn Operating, Inc. ) (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
17 | 17
149
pgs
court
Transcript
Wed 12/13 12:23 AM
Transcript RE: Motion Hearing held on December 6, 2017 before Judge David R. Jones. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 03/13/2018. (mhen) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
Courtroom Minutes
Wed 12/06 3:12 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:30 AM. Appearances: Patricia B Tomasco and Matthew D Cavenaugh for the Linn Reorganized Debtors and the Berry Reorganized Debtors, Jay Hurst for the texas Comptroller. ERO: Alonzo/ Do. . After argument the Court denied the motion to dismiss and set a Rule 16 Hearing for 1/10/2018 at 10:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). Counsel for the plaintiff to upload an order denying the dismissal. (aalo) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Exhibit List
Mon 12/04 9:11 AM
Exhibit List, Witness List (Filed By TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS ) (Hurst, Jay) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
court
Certificate of Notice
Mon 10/23 12:24 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted Jay Hurst. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court . Hearing scheduled for 12/6/2017 at 10:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice
Fri 10/20 4:35 PM
Notice of Hearing . Filed by Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice
Fri 10/20 1:05 PM
Notice of Hearing . Filed by TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS (Hurst, Jay) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
court
Certificate of Notice
Wed 07/19 4:22 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. Due to Mr. Hursts medical situation, the hearing on the motion to dismiss has been postponed until further notice. (aalo) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice
Mon 07/17 2:53 PM
Notice of Hearing . Filed by TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS (Hurst, Jay) |
|
court
Certificate of Notice
Mon 07/17 12:25 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted Jay Hurst. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court Hearing scheduled for 7/26/2017 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo) |
||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Response
Mon 06/12 5:00 PM
Response to Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts' Corrected Motion to Dismiss Complaint . Filed by Linn Operating, Inc. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 05/25 10:43 AM
Proposed Order RE: (Filed By TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS ) (Hurst, Jay) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 05/24 4:31 PM
Corrected Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS (Hurst, Jay) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 05/24 4:03 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS (Hurst, Jay) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 05/04 4:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS 5/4/2017. (Cavenaugh, Matthew) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 8:20 AM
Summons Issued on TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS Date Issued 4/24/2017. (mmap) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 04/22 12:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/21/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 04/19 3:15 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 04/19 2:14 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Wed 04/19 6:30 AM
|
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Tue 04/18 7:46 PM
Adversary case 17-06003 Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint by Linn Operating, Inc. against TEXAS COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS. Fee Amount $350 (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Att: 7 Adversary Cover Sheet |