Lake v. The Royster Group Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02311 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 10, 2017 5:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
LaToyin Rollins
|
|
Defendant
The Royster Group Inc.
|
|
Defendant
William Creim
|
|
Plaintiff
Melvina Lake
P.O. Box 7083
New York, NY 10150 |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 09/20 11:57 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to10 Notice of Appeal filed by Melvina Lake. Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. It is ORDERED that the motion is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED. Issued as Mandate: 9/20/17. USCA 17-1791 (McGee, Mary Ann) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Tue 06/27 11:51 AM
ORDER denying plaintiff's11 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court certifies pursuant to 28:1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/26/2017 ) c/m (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Reconsideration
Mon 06/26 2:40 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re8 Memorandum & Opinion, by Melvina Lake. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 06/06 4:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to9 Clerk's Judgment,8 Memorandum & Opinion, by Melvina Lake. No fee paid. IFP denied for purposes of appeal. (McGee, Mary Ann) |
|
appeal
Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
Tue 06/06 4:15 PM
Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals.10 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann) |
||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 05/15 12:08 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 5/15/17 that the amended complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28:1915 for failure to state a claim; that the second motion to appoint counsel is denied as moot; that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) any appeal would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. ( Ordered by Janet Hamilton, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 5/15/2017 ) c/m w/appeals pkg. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
8 | 8
6
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 05/15 10:37 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 5/13/17 that the amended complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28:1915 for failure to state a claim. The second motion to appoint counsel is denied as moot. The Court certifies pursuant to 28:1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962).( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/13/2017 ) c/m (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 05/12 3:20 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel with request to proceed in forma pauperis in support of application by Melvina Lake. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 05/12 3:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against LaToyin Rollins, The Royster Group Inc., William Creim, filed by Melvina Lake. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/26 12:02 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 4/26/17 granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for purpose of this order and denying3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The complaint is dismissed, and plaintiff is granted leave to amend her complaint within 20 days of the date of this Order ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/26/2017 ) c/m (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 04/19 12:49 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Melvina Lake. (Bowens, Priscilla) | |
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melvina Lake. (Bowens, Priscilla) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against LaToyin Rollins, The Royster Group Inc., filed by Melvina Lake. (Bowens, Priscilla) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |