Williams v. Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02347 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order(Other)
Tue 12/19 4:14 PM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, That Pltff, Bryan Williams, by and through counsel, and hereby files a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of this action, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross, undated) (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 12/14 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bryan Williams (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Mon 11/27 3:36 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to set aside Clerk's Entry of default. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 11/27/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Vacate
Tue 11/21 2:17 PM
MOTION to Vacate18 Clerk's Entry of Default,17 Request for Certificate of Default by Bryan Williams. (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Entry of Clerk's Default Set Aside | ||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 11/15 10:55 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Adjourn 11/15/2017 Conference sine die. Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice and Motion to Vacate the default against Defendant are to be filed on CM/ECF on or before 12/15/2017 addressed to Judge Ross. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/15/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Tue 11/14 5:38 PM
Letter to Magistrate Judge Reyes by Bryan Williams (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 10/31 9:24 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(Poveda, J.) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Fri 10/13 12:30 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Bryan Williams (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Affirmation in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement proposed Certificate of Default | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/29 8:52 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Adjourn Conference; Initial Conference is rescheduled for 11/15/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Case Management Statement9 is due by 11/10/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/28/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 09/28 12:50 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Bryan Williams. (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/16 9:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryan Williams. Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation served on 8/2/2017, answer due 8/23/2017. (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/09 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Harris on behalf of Bryan Williams (notification declined or already on case) (Harris, Keith) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/26 10:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 07/25 12:50 PM
Proposed Summons. Re11 Amended Complaint by Bryan Williams (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 07/25 12:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation, filed by Bryan Williams. (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Notice of Filing First Amended Complaint | ||
10 | 10
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 07/25 9:53 AM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Bryan Williams. (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/25 4:43 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Adjourn 9/7/2017 Conference. Initial Conference is adjourned to 10/11/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes. Jr. Case Management Statement9 is due 10/6/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/25/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/24 10:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/7/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attach blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 9/4/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/24/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/14 9:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/12 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence A. Fuller on behalf of Bryan Williams (aty to be noticed) (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 07/12 12:23 PM
Proposed Summons. by Bryan Williams (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice(Other)
Fri 06/30 5:37 PM
NOTICE by Bryan Williams Plaintiff attorney's Notice of Unavailability (Fuller, Lawrence) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 04/20 4:38 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 04/20 4:37 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/20 4:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Franchise Realty Interstate Corporation. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/19 4:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9461854 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Bryan Williams. (Harris, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/20 4:30 PM
Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |