Kane v. La Savage et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lynn Adelman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00556 |
Nature of Suit | 560 Prisoner Petitions - Civil Detainee - Conditions of Confinement |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Thu 06/29 1:30 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/29/17. (cc: all counsel, Plaintiff)(gc) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 06/28 2:55 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/28/17 that this action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Civil L. R. 41(c) based on the plaintiff's failure to prosecute. (cc: all counsel, Plaintiff, Warden)(gc) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Thu 06/29 9:38 AM
Case Terminated pursuant to8 Order (bx) |
||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/26 11:23 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman for screening order. (lz) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Fri 06/02 3:21 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 6/2/2017 that on or before 6/23/2017 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ $6.39 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. It appears that plaintiff no longer wants to prosecute this case. If he does not submit the initial partial filing fee by 6/23/2017, this action may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. A copy of this order and the court's 4/24/2017 order shall be mailed to plaintiff at the following address: 1900 Pewaukee Road, Suite I, Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to plaintiff as noted in order)(lz) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 05/09 1:47 PM
Mail Sent to Abrian E Kane4 addressed to Oakhill Correctional Institution Returned as Undeliverable. (lz) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Mon 04/24 3:42 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/24/2017 that on or before 5/15/2017 Plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 6.39 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. If Plaintiff does not wish to pay the initial partial filing fee or if he wishes to dismiss this action to avoid potentially incurring a strike under 28 USC §1915(g) he must notify the court by filing a letter with the Clerk of Court on or before 5/15/2017. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff, Warden-Oakhill Corr. Inst., Financial Dept.)(lz) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Wed 04/19 3:12 PM
LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (lz) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Wed 04/19 3:05 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Abrian E Kane. (lz) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Wed 04/19 3:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Abrian E Kane.(lz) |
|
Att: 1 Petition and Affidavit to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and/or Costs | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Prisoner
Wed 04/19 2:53 PM
PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Sgt La Savage, Oakhill Correctional Institution by Abrian E Kane. (Filing Fee NOT PAID $400) (lz) |