Niche Marketing, Inc. v. Jeffrey D. Lenney et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Jay C Gandhi |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00722 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
JLenney Marketing, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Jeffrey D. Lenney
|
|
Plaintiff
Niche Marketing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
![]() CONSENT DECREE AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court ORDERS as follows: This Court has jurisdiction over the parties to this action and over the subject matter hereof pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1125(a); The Court finds there is no just reason for delay in entering this Injunction and, pursuant to Rule 54(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court directs immediate entry of this Injunction against Defendants; and The Court shall retain jurisdiction over Defendants and of this action to entertain such further proceedings and to enter such further orders as may be necessary or appropriate to implement and enforce the provisions of this Injunction or of the parties' Settlement Agreement and General Release dated July 25, 2017. See document for further information. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lwag) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Niche Marketing, Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Randazza, Marc) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Joint STIPULATION for Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff Niche Marketing, Inc..(Randazza, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER granting Third Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)17 , defendants JLenney Marketing, LLC answer due 8/17/2017; Jeffrey D. Lenney answer due 8/17/2017 by Judge Josephine L. Staton (twdb) Modified on 7/18/2017 (twdb) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 17, 2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Niche Marketing, Inc..(Randazza, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants Jeffrey D. Lenney and JLenney Marketing, LLC to Respond to Initial Complaint15 . The Court has reviewed the parties' Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Initial Complaint ("Stipulation"). The Court GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS that Defendants Jeffrey D. Lenney and JLenney Marketing, LLC ("Defendants") shall have through July 18, 2017, to respond to the Complaint. Defendants by signing the Stipulation are not making a general appearance and are not waiving any defenses in connection with the above-captioned matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dro) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 07/18/2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Niche Marketing, Inc..(Randazza, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JLenney Marketing, LLC answer now due 6/18/2017; Jeffrey D. Lenney answer now due 6/18/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Niche Marketing, Inc..(Randazza, Marc) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant JLenney Marketing, LLC. (twdb) |
|
12 | 12
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Jeffrey D. Lenney. (twdb) |
|
11 | 11
![]() INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
![]() REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Niche Marketing, Inc.. (Randazza, Marc) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Niche Marketing, Inc..(Randazza, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (et) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Niche Marketing, Inc., (Randazza, Marc) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Niche Marketing, Inc..(Randazza, Marc) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Niche Marketing, Inc.. (Randazza, Marc) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19717475 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Niche Marketing, Inc.. (Attorney Marc J Randazza added to party Niche Marketing, Inc.(pty:pla))(Randazza, Marc) |