In re Nexus 6P Products Liability Litigation
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Referred: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-02185 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 1:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Huawei Device USA, Inc.
Covington & Burling LLP 1 Front Street
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Google LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Beheler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Khanh Tran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Servodio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Poore, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Martorello
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Leone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Johnston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Himes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alex Gorbatchev
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yuriy Davydov
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Christensen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Berry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colton Winfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Makcharoenwoodhi
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed alleging Nexus 6P devices are defective, prone to enter bootloop cycle (arstechnica.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/20/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 15, 2022 | ||
241 | 241
![]() ORDER GRANTING 240 STIPULATION AUTHORIZING FURTHER AND FINAL RESIDUAL DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FUND by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
240 | 240
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Authorizing Further and Final, Residual Distribution of Class Settlement Funds filed by Edward Beheler, Brian Christensen, Yuriy Davydov, Alex Gorbatchev, Rebecca Harrison, Zachary Himes, Kenneth Johnston, Taylor Jones, Justin Leone, Jonathan Makcharoenwoodhi, Anthony Martorello, James Poore, Jr., Paul Servodio.(Polk, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |