Dean Sheikh et al v. Tesla, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-02193 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 16, 2017 2:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
Tesla, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Kelner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tom Milone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Sheikh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dan Whelan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daury Lamarche
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Verdolen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Verdolin
|
Represented By
|
1. | Tesla owners have filed a class-action lawsuit alleging Autopilot 2 is 'demonstrably dangerous' (businessinsider.com) |
Submitted Fri 04/21/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |