Rafi v. Brigham and Women's Hospital, et al
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-civil-01373 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2018 3:30 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
BRIGHAM & WOMEN'S HOSPITAL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL BOSTON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HARVARD MEDICAL SCHOOL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SYED RAFI, Ph.D.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SYED K. RAFI, Ph.D.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/19/2018 3:30 AM EST |
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #83) filed by Appellant Syed Rafi. PLEASE NOTE: The December 1, 2016 amendment to the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure made significant changes to appellate practice. The full text of the amendments, as well as a summary of major rule changes, is available here. The changes went into effect on December 1, 2016. 17-1373 (TS) |