Belanger, et al v. BNY Mellon, N.A., et al
Original Case: 1:15-cv-10198
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-civil-01376 |
Type | civil / private / other statutes |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 08, 2018 3:30 AM EST |
Defendant
ROBERT PORTNEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARY ANN REMILLARD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT LEDOUX
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DIANE POWELL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MICHAEL SPRINGMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHERI MYETTE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MICHAEL NOVACK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PING CUI
|
|
Defendant
JANICE FUNK
|
|
Defendant
MERRIMACK VALLEY HOSPITAL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KAI HAYES
|
|
Defendant
PIERCE & MANDELL, PC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SCOTT DAILEY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PETER W. COHEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KENNEY ENTERPRISES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRENDA WOJICK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SHERYL SIDMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ALAN SIDMAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRANDON H. SAUNDERS, Esq.
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM AUSTIN, CPA
|
|
Defendant
BERID & SCHUTZBANK, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WALTER A. COSTELLO, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRANDON H. SAUNDERS, ESQ.
|
|
Defendant
JAMES FELD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THOMAS J. BARBAR
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BURNS & LEVINSON, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LISA CUKIER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LAURA R. STUDEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MARSHA VERON KAZAROSIAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KAZAROSIAN, COSTELLO & O'DONNELL LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WALTER COSTELLO, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRIAN T. CUFFE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BNY MELLON, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BRIAN NAGLE, Esq.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TARLOW, BREED, HART & RODGERS, PC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RICHARD GARY GARMIL, ESQ.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MAXA BERID, ESQ.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CATHERINE WATSON, ESQ.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BERID & SCHUTZBANK, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ALBERT A. DENAPOLI, ESQ.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
EDWARD D. TARLOW, ESQ.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BRIAN NAGLE, ESQ.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
EDWARD D. TARLOW, Esq.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ALBERT A. DENAPOLI, Esq.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CATHERINE WATSON, Esq.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MAXA BERID, Esq.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ELDER SERVICES OF MERRIMACK VALLEY, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
HVLCORP., d/b/a Whittier Pavilion
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NORTHEAST HOSPITAL CORPORATION, d/b/a Beverly Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RICHARD GARY GARMIL, Esq.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM AUSTIN, CPA
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
LISA SIEGEL BELANGER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DEVORA C. KAISER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/08/2018 3:30 AM EST |
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #179) filed by Appellants Lisa Siegel Belanger and Devora C. Kaiser. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 05/09/2017. PLEASE NOTE: The December 1, 2016 amendment to the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure made significant changes to appellate practice. The full text of the amendments, as well as a summary of major rule changes, is available here. The changes went into effect on December 1, 2016. 17-1376 (GB) |