Rios v. The United States of America et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward R Korman |
Referred: | Lois Bloom |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02360 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
54 Maujer Street LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Rios
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Cross Claimant
54 Maujer Street LLC
Terminated: 09/12/2017
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
The United States of America
Terminated: 09/06/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The United States of America
Terminated: 09/06/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 01/08 2:38 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 1/8/2018. (Chefitz, Jacob) |
||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 10/18 1:35 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of plaintiff's claims against 54 Maujer Street LLC by Samuel Rios (Abruzzino, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Tue 09/12 4:13 PM
Order Dismissing Parties Party 54 Maujer Street LLC (Cross Claimant) terminated.Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 9/12/2017. (Basnight, Jasmine) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
order
Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Mon 09/11 10:35 AM
ORDER: Counsel for defendant 54 Maujer Street LLC writes to notify the Court that the parties are dismissing the instant case with prejudice. (ECF No. 19.) Defendant then submitted a stipulation of dismissal. (ECF No. 20.) However, the filed stipulation relates to another case, Docket No. 16-cv-6356 (RRM)(RML), and not the instant matter. Therefore, plaintiff's counsel shall immediately file the correct stipulation of dismissal. In light of the parties' request to discontinue the case, the Court cancels the September 13, 2017 initial conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/11/2017. (Doody, Sara) |
||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 09/08 2:18 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of all claims and cross claims without prejudice against SL Properties, Inc. by 54 Maujer Street LLC (Correia, Doreen) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Status Report
Fri 09/08 2:02 PM
STATUS REPORT by 54 Maujer Street LLC (Correia, Doreen) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/07 4:32 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of cross-claims against United States of America without prejudice by The United States of America (Cho, James) |
|
Att: 1 (stipulation of dismissal of cross-claims against United States of America without prejudice) | ||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Thu 09/07 2:45 PM
Order Dismissing Parties: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Plaintiff Samuel Rios ("Plaintiff") and Defendant United States of America ("Defendant" or "Government"), by their respective undersigned attorneys, as follows: 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(i), all of Plaintiff's claims against Defendant United States of America are dismissed without prejudice, except that nothing set forth herein shall prejudice any of Plaintiff's claims against the Co-defendant 54 Maujer Street, LLC ("Co-Defendant"), or Co-defendant's cross-claims against the Government. 2. Plaintiff and the Government agree that tills dismissal is without costs or fees. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 9/6/2017. (Basnight, Jasmine) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 08/31 11:33 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of plaintiff's claims against the United States by The United States of America (Cho, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Protective Order
Mon 08/28 4:46 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR THE PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION, endorsed on doc.#14 : SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 8/25/2017 (page # 8). ( See document for details.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion for Protective Order
Fri 08/25 4:44 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File: Defendant United States of America writes to request a two-week extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint and co-defendant's cross-claim or, in the alternative, to file a stipulation of dismissal. (ECF No. 14.) This is the government's fourth request for an extension of time to respond, and both the plaintiff and co-defendant consent. The request is granted. Should the parties resolve their claims against defendant United States of America, they shall file a joint stipulation discontinuing plaintiff's claims by September 7, 2017. Otherwise, defendant United States of America shall answer the plaintiff's complaint and co-defendant's cross-claims by September 7, 2017, in preparation for the September 13, 2017 initial conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/25/2017. (Doody, Sara) |
||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document Protective Order
Thu 08/24 6:34 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File stipulation of dismissal or respond to the complaint and cross claim , Consent MOTION for Protective Order (between the United States and 54 Maujer Street LLC) by The United States of America. (Cho, James) |
|
Att: 1 (confidentiality stipulation and order for the protection of documents and information) | ||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 08/22 12:20 PM
ORDER: For the sake of clarity, the previously scheduled August 29, 2017 initial conference is not taking place. The August 29, 2017 initial conference is adjourned until September 13, 2017, pursuant to my August 10, 2017 Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/22/2017. (Doody, Sara) |
||
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Scheduling Order
Thu 08/10 11:28 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant United States of America writes to request a two-week extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint and co-defendant's cross-claim. (ECF No. 13.) This is the government's third extension request (second this week), and the plaintiff and co-defendant consent. Defendant United States of America states that this extension will allow the parties to continue their ongoing settlement discussions in hopes of reaching a resolution. The request is granted. If the parties are unable to resolve this matter by August 24, 2017, defendant United States of America shall respond to plaintiff's complaint and the co-defendant's cross-claim by that date. The Court shall hold an initial conference on September 13, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United State Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file their Rule 26(f) Meeting Report with the Court by September 8, 2017. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. A request for an adjournment must be received in writing at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. If the parties notify the Court that they have reached a settlement in principal by September 11, 2017, the Court will cancel the initial conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/10/2017. (Doody, Sara) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 08/09 5:46 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint and cross-claims) by The United States of America. (Cho, James) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 08/09 10:26 AM
ORDER, endorsed on the United States of America's11 Motion for an Extension of Time to File Response to Co-Defendant's Cross-Claims by 8/10/2017. The application is granted. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 8/8/2017. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/07 6:01 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (motion for 3-day extension of time to respond to co-defendant's cross-claims) by The United States of America. (Cho, James) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Scheduling Order
Fri 06/23 10:53 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant United States of America writes to request a 45-day extension of time to respond to the complaint. (ECF No. 10.) This is defendant's first request and plaintiff consents. The request is granted. Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by August 10, 2017. The Court shall hold an initial conference on August 29, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) and file the Rule 26(f) meeting report by August 24, 2017. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/23/2017. (Doody, Sara) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 06/22 5:31 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by The United States of America. (Cho, James) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/22 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Cho on behalf of The United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Cho, James) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Wed 06/07 6:29 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against The United States of America by 54 Maujer Street LLC. (Correia, Doreen) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/07 6:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by 54 Maujer Street LLC (Correia, Doreen) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Fri 05/19 4:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service by Samuel Rios (Abruzzino, Robert) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Fri 05/19 4:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service by Samuel Rios (Abruzzino, Robert) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 04/21 3:21 PM
Summons Issued as to 54 Maujer Street LLC, The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 04/21 3:18 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 04/21 3:16 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/21 3:16 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Edward R. Korman and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/20 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9464165 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Samuel Rios. (Abruzzino, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |