Albertson v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Referred: | James L Cott |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02861 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 17, 2017 5:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer Oy
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Christina Albertson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
62 | 62
![]() CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (66 in 1:17-cv-02883-PAE-JLC, 63 in 1:17-cv-02866-PAE-JLC, 78 in 1:17-cv-02792-PAE-JLC, 67 in 1:17-cv-02798-PAE-JLC, 137 in 1:17-cv-02674-PAE-JLC, 78 in 1:17-cv-02854-PAE-JLC, 69 in 1:17-cv-02853-PAE-JLC, 77 in 1:17-cv-02791-PAE-JLC, 76 in 1:17-cv-02738-PAE-JLC, 84 in 1:17-cv-02737-PAE-JLC, 63 in 1:17-cv-02891-PAE-JLC, 68 in 1:17-cv-02856-PAE-JLC, 68 in 1:17-cv-02821-PAE-JLC, 66 in 1:17-cv-02895-PAE-JLC, 61 in 1:17-cv-02861-PAE-JLC, 79 in 1:17-cv-02745-PAE-JLC, 74 in 1:17-cv-02724-PAE-JLC, 74 in 1:17-cv-02887-PAE-JLC, 69 in 1:17-cv-02807-PAE-JLC, 63 in 1:17-cv-02865-PAE-JLC, 347 in 1:17-md-02767-PAE-JLC, 75 in 1:17-cv-02721-PAE-JLC, 72 in 1:17-cv-02826-PAE-JLC, 78 in 1:17-cv-02794-PAE-JLC, 81 in 1:17-cv-02718-PAE-JLC, 72 in 1:17-cv-02790-PAE-JLC, 73 in 1:17-cv-02814-PAE-JLC, 79 in 1:17-cv-02741-PAE-JLC, 71 in 1:17-cv-02878-PAE-JLC, 70 in 1:17-cv-02811-PAE-JLC, 79 in 1:17-cv-02719-PAE-JLC, 68 in 1:17-cv-02819-PAE-JLC, 82 in 1:17-cv-02781-PAE-JLC, 79 in 1:17-cv-02797-PAE-JLC, 85 in 1:17-cv-02715-PAE-JLC, 68 in 1:17-cv-02812-PAE-JLC, 73 in 1:17-cv-02851-PAE-JLC, 71 in 1:17-cv-02816-PAE-JLC, 81 in 1:17-cv-02778-PAE-JLC, 68 in 1:17-cv-02827-PAE-JLC, 122 in 1:17-cv-02694-PAE-JLC, 98 in 1:17-cv-02698-PAE-JLC, 70 in 1:17-cv-02874-PAE-JLC, 91 in 1:17-cv-02705-PAE-JLC, 68 in 1:17-cv-02872-PAE-JLC, 55 in 1:17-cv-02692-PAE-JLC) Memorandum & Opinion,,. in favor of Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.,, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Oy, Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer healthcare pharmaceuticals, inc. against Abigail Michel, Abigail Thiesing, Abra Coning, Abra L. Coning, Adam Klopfenstein, Adrian Clark, Adrienne Seuzeneau, Aida Lozada, Aimee Galloway, Aisha Cuffie, Aislynn Pounds, Alaina Dice, Alana Sirmans, Alecia Conner, Alecia Henry, Aleta Brek Richards, Alexandra Haines, Alexandria Estrada, Alexis Gallien, Alexis Walton, Alfreda Bolden, Alicia Ruffin, Alicia Thames, Alinkie Joseph, Alisha Scudder, Alison Ashcroft, Aliya Quick, Allison Simpson, Alyssa Johnson, Alysta Espinal, Alyxis Feltus, Amanda Clark, Amanda Crites, Amanda Evans, Amanda Garcia, Amanda Goodlet, Amanda Harvey, Amanda Massie, Amanda Pichla, Amanda Sailors, Amanda Santoro, Amanda Stevens, Amanda Waite, Amanda Wilson, Amanda Wolters, Amanda Leeann Barber, Amber Brueggert, Amber Fennell, Amber Hanson, Amber Hoda, Amber Large, Amber Ostermiller-Ecord, Amber Darlene Prout, Amber R. Dryden, Amberly Buckner, Amelia Holman Miles, Amy Ammons, Amy Cholewinski, Amy Edwards, Amy Hodge, AnJanet Coleman, Anais Forcier, Analycia Sanchez, Andrea Bruno, Andrea Easter, Andrea Gee, Andrea Johnson, Andrea Lucero, Andrea Martinez, Andrea Novak, Andrea Robinson, Andrea Vega, Andria Reed, Angela Henderson, Angela Klopfenstein, Angela Kolebuck Utz, Angela Norred, Angela Robinson, Angela Schneider, Angela Rose Padilla, Angelina Sharidan, Angeline Stanger, Angell Navarre, Anisha Longmire, Anita Long, Anitra Wade, Ann Everett, Anna Conley, Annalissa Sanchez, Anne Guillot, Anne Wilson, April Galloway, April Johnson, April Robertson, Arielle Catron, Arin Boehmer, Arlene Cordero, Arrielle Hughes, Asha' Ana Thomas, Ashley Antkowiak, Ashley Babich-Zacharias, Ashley Davis, Ashley Mandoline, Ashley McCune, Ashley McLuckie, Ashley Nobles-Hobbs, Ashley Pearson, Ashley Rodriguez, Ashley Steed, Ashli Garner, Ashly Amber Cockrell, Ashlyn Hackworth-Williams, Ashton Silvis, Asia Shakespeare, Audrey Joines, Barbara Anderson, Barbara Napier, Bernesha Means, Bess Patterson, Beth Burton, Bethany Vincent, Betty Wempe, Billy Cheek, Bonnie Cedano, Brandi Carroll, Brandi Favors, Brandi Geddings, Brandy Fletcher, Brayanne Ford, Breanna Pieters, Breanna Williams, Brenda Yearout, Briana Garner, Briana McCranie, Briana Stills, Brianna Blackman, Brianna Peters, Brianna Smith, Brianne Trigger, Bridget Coburn, Bridgette Blunt, Brigette Morris, Brigitte Cockcroft, Britney Murphy, Britney Thompson, Brittany Collins, Brittany Greco, Brittany Harsch, Brittany Shumpert, Brittany Thomas, Brittany Watkins, Brittany Wilson, Brittany Nicole James, Brittany S. Smith, Brittney M. Gentry, Brooke Birge, Caitlyn Aboulba, Callie Jordan, Candace Crovetto, Candice Arnwine, Candice Bailey, Candice Small, Carla Walcott, Carley Hamilton, Carmen Morales, Carneshia Cason, Carol Jackson, Carolina Romero, Carolyn Sutton, Carrie Breaux, Carrie Thompson, Cassandra Becker, Cassandra N Johnson, Catherine Andrade, Catherine Godfrey, Catherine Jensen, Catherine King, Catherine Martinez, Catherine Dianne Beitel, Catie Kessler, Chandra Brown, Chandra Mason, Chanell Winn, Chanthinia White, Chaquita Dudley, Charla Myers-Perkins, Charlene Gomez, Charles Monet, Charlotte Brown, Charlotte Stribling, Charmina Lewis, Chassidy Fruge, Chavon Plange, Cheetarr Jackson, Chelsea Coulter, Chelsea Van Wert, Chelsea M. Sawyer, Chelsea Marie Bryant, Chelsey Baudoin, Cherie Mcgee, Cheryl Danielle Brodfehrer, Chessica Maus, Cheylo Collado, Christa Diehl, Christal Baugh, Christi Utley, Christie Epperly, Christina Holland, Christina Ray, Christina Reid, Christine Wilson, Christon Fore, Christopher Barlow, Christy Nicole Mcgregor, Christy S. Murphy, Chyneice Oliver, Ciara Hayes, Ciera Cole, Ciera Lamb, Ciera Turner, Cierra Denise Garner, Cindel Downs, Cindy N. Best, Clara Allen, Clarity Pavon-Moore, Conica Winston, Constance Steele, Cora Clear, Corneisha Foster, Cortnie Short, Cosette Posorski, Courtney Smith, Courtney Trennepohl, Crystal Barlow, Crystal Covert, Crystal Rodgers, Crystal Taylor, Crystal Vazquez, Cynthia Gunn, Cynthia Munro, Daffney Hicks, Dalia Jasso, Dana Y Cooper, Danica Hendricks, Daniel Bourgoin, Daniel Parsons, Daniella Pavelka, Danielle Adams, Danielle Butler, Danielle Holt, Danielle Korte, Danielle Schmidt, Danielle Wehrley, Danise Hoffman, Danyell Russell, Daphne Franklin, Daphne Houck, Darnesia Finkley, David Burns, David Rodriguez, Davita Robinson, Dawn Breen, DeShera Myers, Deanna Mooney, Delilah Perez, Denise Ancar, Denise Ford, Denise Keiderling, Deshaunna Johnson, Deshonda Knight, Desiree Lemaster, Desiree Saenz, Detra Ferguson, Devina Williams, Devon Mahlstedt, Devon Parker, Devon Pinckney, Dewayna Denille Brown, Diana Leonard, Dodie Arnold, Donisha Bishop, Donisha Butler, Donna Harris, Donna Rawdon, Doretha Smith, Dorionne Huntington, Dyonche Willis, Ebonee Richardson, Eboni Shaw, Ebony Ray, Ebony Taylor, Elizabeth Adams, Elizabeth Bryce, Elizabeth Damron, Elizabeth Heagy, Elizabeth Montanaro, Elizabeth Olson, Elizabeth Paige, Elizabeth K. Moore, Ellen Burns, Emilie Sitzman, Emillie Hopper, Emily Cokrlic, Emily Springer, Erendira Cuevas, Erica Owens, Erica Rodriguez, Erica Silva, Erica Smith, Erica Williams, Ericka Jones-George, Ericka Turner, Erika Claiborne, Erika Nacke, Eshia Davis, Eve Sims, Faith Law, Fallon Evans, Felita Dooley, Flora Jordan, Freddrekia Bradley, Gabrielle Hoffman, Gashia Williams, Gembelle Horlacher, Georgia Foster, Gina Baker, Ginger Kuchler, Gloria Fields, Gloribi Pastor, Grace Dixon, Graceann Robinson, Guadalupe Pineda, Hailey Shelton, Haley Henn, Hannah Rutledge, Hattie Hansen, Heather Baker, Heather Cruver, Heather Garcia, Heather Hemberger, Heather Kuramoto, Heather Nicolle Mcmullan, Heather Onsum Stoops, Heidi Rosenow, Heidi Thomas, Hillery Thompson, Holly Allen, Holly Jones, Hope Garcia, Hope Gayle, Ieacha Jackson, Ingrid Bustos, Jaclyn Herald, Jaclyn Spett, Jacob Roseland, Jacqueline Goyena, Jacqueline Sherley-Douglas, Jacquelyn Seifert, Jade A. Ludwikowski, Jaime Peller, Jaime Powell, Jalisa Crapo, James Esparza, Jami Olson, Jamie O'Bryan, Jamie Whitely, Jamisha Dyer, Janeka Haynes, Janell Davis, Janelle Pallansch, Jasman Al-Shwaiyat, Jasmin Thurman, Jasmine Baynham, Jasmine Howard, Jasmine Lefort, Jasmine Short, Jayde Seaford, Jeanie Lascelles, Jefkida Johnson-Stinson, Jena Cook, Jenna True, Jennifer Baxter, Jennifer Draughn, Jennifer Drayton, Jennifer Ducre, Jennifer Gibliant, Jennifer Guzdek, Jennifer Hull, Jennifer Legassie, Jennifer Sand-Shequen, Jennifer Santiago, Jennifer Sisson, Jennifer Sullivan, Jennifer Ure, Jennifer Lynn Carr-Amonett, Jeralyn Wiley, Jeresa Morgan, Jerica Schaffer, Jerrelda Sanders, Jerry Jane Wynne, Jessica Bihler, Jessica Cash, Jessica Crouse, Jessica Fuller, Jessica Gardner, Jessica Grabill, Jessica Guglielmo, Jessica Hupman, Jessica Jefferson, Jessica Jett, Jessica Kilbourne, Jessica Nieslawski, Jessica Oqueli, Jessica Roberson, Jessica Roseland, Jessica Stanley, Jessica Watson, Jessica Wein, Jessica White, Jessica Hixson Robinson, Jessica Lynn Simmons, Jessica Marie Peterson, Jessika Allen, Jetta Allen, Jevon Bogan, Jill Genovesi, Jill Johnson, Jill Sneed, JoAn Redfield, Joanna Lynn Lucero, Joanna Momoko Cline, Jodie Swoffer, John Silva, III, Jonathan Miles, Jonel Edwards, Joshua Gentry, Joy Myers, Jozzette Randle, Juanita Figueroa, Julia Ferguson, Julia Meachem, Juliana Catarina Hernandez, Julie Garcia, Julie Gonzalez, Julie LaVigne, Julie Nelson, Julie Spencer, Kaitlin Stringfellow, Kaitlyn Sklenar, Kalena Williams, Kamille Turnbow, Kaqante Brown, Kara Stanley, Kareama Patterson, Karen Crear, Karen Francis, Karla M. Duelley, Karlena Jenks, Karna Lynne Pettlon, Karrie Shields, Kasey Garrison, Kasey Jackson, Kassandra Halstead, Kate Jensen, Katelyn Tower, Katelynn Hammond, Katharine Wells, Katherine Jacobsen, Katherine Sotelo, Kathleen Cheek, Kathleen Fox, Kathleen Frizzell, Kathleen Huerta, Kathleen Molina, Kathleen Renata Seegers, Kathleena Hays, Kathryn Asbel, Kati Valentine, Katie Arabie, Katie Decker, Katie Myers, Katie Schubel, Katie Lynn Arabie, Katie Rebecca Lawrence, Katomia Morris, Katrena Warr, Katrice Roussell, Katrina Everett-Carey, Katrina Stevenson, Kay Page, Kayla Clayton, Kayla Faulkner, Kayla Owens, Kayla Scott, Kayla Talley, Kaytlin Raines, Keionne Thompson, Keisha Currie, Keisha Pierce, Keisha Seward, Kelli Salazar, Kelli Boyt Rowland, Kelly Casnave, Kelly Cichetti, Kelly Harrigan, Kelly Kennedy, Kelly Reis, Kelly Riegel-Green, Kelsey Harris, Kelsey Jackson, Kelsey Ramm, Kemisha Wilder, Kendra Hill, Kendra Patterson, Kendra Wickware, Keona Burton, Keri Rice, Keshia Barnette, Keysa Ellis, Keyshara Armstead, Khadijah Robinson, Khalilah Bowens, Khelee Sawyer, Kia Barnes, Kiera McClendon, Kimberly Barrow, Kimberly Black, Kimberly Burkhart, Kimberly Davis, Kimberly Grant, Kimberly Hamilton, Kimberly Henao, Kimberly Jackson, Kimberly Landry, Kimberly Macaulay, Kimberly McKinney, Kimberly Moulton, Kimberly Stewart, Kimberly Stier, Kimberly Taffer, Kimmi Vesey, Kindra Nelson, Krista Burke, Kristen Campbell, Kristen Denise Bryan, Kristen N. Chandler, Kristin Andrick, Kristin Carrico, Kristy Collins, Krystle Wood, Kylara Booth, Kyondra Albert, L'Ticia Sias, LaTonya Hilliard, LaToya S. Thompson, LaVonda Lewis, Lacey Hubert, Lacey Langston Sanderlin, Lakeyshia Tate, Lamara Walker, Larissa Way, Laryna Lewis, Lashonda Robins, Latarsha Paschal, Latasha Monet, Latonya Hoskin, Latoria Woodall, Latosha Lewis, Latoya Green, Latoya Hunt, Latoya Kendrix, Latoya Stevenson, Latricia Anderson Johnson, Laura Boyce, Laura Bryan, Laura Burns, Laura Dacus, Laura Frisby, Laura Gabriel, Lauren Carman, Lauren Davren, Lauren Donaldson, Lauren Hardwick, Lauren Hollobaugh, Lauren Roberts, Lauren Elizabeth Singleton, Lavonda Davenport, Leah Fackrell, Leah Southard, Leigh Roderick, Leona Jimmerson, Lequita Neely, Leslee Diaz, Leslie Berry, Leslie Fatz, Leslie Martin, Leslie Marie Coapman, Liana Erb, Lillie Battle-Eason, Lindsay Boone, Lindsay Miller, Lindsay Tranum, Lindsey Cadwell, Lindsey Grady, Lindsey Ross, Lisa Clanton, Lisa Frazier, Lisa Kuehl, Lisa Settle, Lisa Vallery, Lois Michelle Palmer, Lori Annalora, Lori Hartford, Lycia Sledge, Lyssa Kirk, Macey Beeler, Madison Fowler, Madonna Lynn Dugas, Magan Wills, Maguile Seymour, Makeyta Anderson, Malkia Woodward, Mallory Breckenridge, Mandy Mitlyng, Margaret Bender, Maria Aguilar, Maria Pitts, Maria Rodriguez, Marian Cale, Marie Shiver, Marisol Marcano, Marlene Mendez, Marquisa Johnson, Marquita Williams, Marqusey Evans, Marsha Sapp Hankins, Mary Burdette, Mary Doran, Mary Norton, Mary Smith, Mary Walker, Mary Margaret Cottingham, Mary Jo Tracey, Maryssa Reese, Maureen Garrett, Maurissa Harris, Megan Dean, Megan Harris, Megan Isham, Megan Miller, Megan Robinson, Melanie Howe, Melinda Dobson, Melinda Joseph, Melissa DiLosa, Melissa Fusco, Melissa Love, Melissa Martin, Melissa Polomsky, Melissa Snow, Melissa Tolbert, Melissa Frances Hall, Melissa S. Hopkins, Michelle Kaplan, Michelle Morgan, Michelle Rutherford, Michelle Thomas, Michelle Vaeth, Michelle Whitted, Miranda Gledhill, Misty Coleman-Woods, Misty Mccandless, Misty Reitz, Misty Solomon, Mokeda Alexander, Monica Anderton, Monique Dunmiles, Mylah Nwankwo, Nadia Body, Nadine Kellam, Naomi Williams, Naomi Wilson, Naquasha Riser, Natalee Williams, Natalie Stevanus, Natasha Manning, Natashka Miller, Nayeli Juarez-Garcia, Nedra Bell, Ni'Matullah King, Nichole Hiller, Nichole Hitchcock, Nichole Thomas, Nicola Nunery, Nicole Amaro, Nicole Askin, Nicole Clark, Nicole Hamill, Nicole Jackson, Nicole Lasso, Nicole Lowry, Nicole Major, Nicole Mazzanti, Nicole Parker, Nicole Perkins, Nicole Sweitzer, Nicole Vincent, Nicole White, Nija Johnson, Nikia Brown, Noelle Hickey, Nora Mata, Norma Thomas, Olushola Walker, Paige Olson, Patrice Webster, Patrice Renee Frank, Paula D'Amico, Paula C Garcia, Paulena White, Peggy Pospichel, Peterson Bridges, Porsche Davis, Porsche Patterson, Quantashia Mosley-Morris, Quashunna Miller, Quiana Bryant, Quineisha Judd, Quintella Landry, Rachael Nikl, Rachel Freitas, Rachel McIntyre, Rachel Elizabeth Sammons, Rachelle Lilly, Randi White, Rebecca Durden, Rebecca Elwood, Rebekah Rogers, Renee Pilcher, Reva McDonald, Rhonda Diamond, Rhonda Pezzullo, Rickeya Freeman, Rikki Satterfield, Robert Zinn, Robin Coleman, Robin Guidry, Rochell Myles, Rosanna Knudsen, Rose Rainey, Rosean Moore, Roxanne Bendick, Sabrina Boisaubin, Sadie Miller, Samantha Allen, Samantha Darby, Samantha Davis, Samantha Liford, Samantha Staats, Samantha Williams, Sandy Tatum, Sara Sutphin, Sara Washburn, Sara Tess Sanborn, Sarah Boettger, Sarah Hafer, Sarah Jenkins, Sarah Ottmar, Sarah Anne McLaughlin, Sarah Marie Wessel, Schameka Santa Cruze, Sedona Blake, Selena Irvin, Sequilla Garrett, Sha.Debra Collier, Shadana Reliford-Palmer, Shahira Osman, Shakara Carter, Shakeema Moore, Shamara Von Lane, Shameka M Bridges, Shamikki Shipp, Shane Hausner, Shaneen Thompson, Shanekua Watkins, Shanelle Harris, Shannon Walker, Shantell Fields, Shantella Brown Sanders, Shantrell Talton, Shaquanda McMillion, Shaquetta Felder, Shari Hernandez, Sharish Davis, Sharla Berndt, Sharon Cain, Sharon Toups, Shavonte Johnson, Shawn August, Shawna Louise Cooper, Shayna S. Cook, Sheena Cheneau, Shelain Cooper, Shelby Luann McCain, Shelia Spearman, Shenequa Perdue, Sheree Mitchell, Sherricker Rodgers, Sherrie Lewis, Shontae Blount, Shonton L Burton, Shunika Hemingway, Sierra Moore, Sierra Radden, Simin Kashani, Siobhan Schall, Sonya Ramsey, Stacie Huffer, Stacy Bryan, Stacy Camino, Stacy Beth Swenton, Starla McCollum, Stefanie Thacker, Steffanie Michelle Dennis, Stephanie Adams, Stephanie Baker, Stephanie Bennett, Stephanie Brewer, Stephanie Burt, Stephanie Clark, Stephanie Coen, Stephanie Dawson, Stephanie Grady, Stephanie Pelletier, Stephanie Schlueter, Stephanie Sellers, Stephanie Stockman, Stephanie Treat, Stephanie Christina Albertson, Steven Bryan, Sundria Carroll, Susan Toomey, Suzie Dangerfield, Sylvia Greer, Sylvia Hagans, Tabitha Lee, Tabitha Saylor, Tachicka Robinson, Tamara Whalin, Tamatha Tucker-Whitaker, Tamekia Perteet, Tami Unroe, Tamika Hyde, Tammi Miller, Tammie Wire, Tammy Schatzberg, Tammy Michelle House, Tanazia McCants, Tanera Dale-Napper, Tania Kent, Tanika Brumfield, Taniqua Bletcher, Tanisha Jones, Tankia Rhodes, Taquoya Keryawna Williams, Tashena Eason, Teri Carmicheal, Terraine Zeno, Tess Morse, Tessa Watts, Texas Blundell, Tiara Mitchell, Tierra Hall, Tierra Jackson, Tierra Slack, Tiffani Dalton, Tiffany Collins, Tiffany Debusk, Tiffany Fitch, Tiffany Hausner, Tiffany Mosley, Tiffany Sawyer, Tina Personette, Tina Webber, Tirzah Marie Ellet, Tomeka Williams-James, Toni Ivy, Toni Streeter, Toni E Coleman, Tonia Blalock, Tonia Rouege, Tonina Bartles, Tonja Abiakam, Tonya Allen, Tracy D. Gould, Trasula Clark, Trichelle Harrison Robinson, Tricia Ponicki, Tristyn Ariyan, Truemeka Wallace, Tymeika Baskin, Tyna Reese, Tyrunsia Lowe, Tyshea Mott, Valerie Arthur, Valerie Townsend, Valiencia Parker, Vanessa Bourgoin, Victoria Houpy, Victoria Kyakuwa, Victoria Lee, Vivian Daigle, Wendy Brown, Whitney Homer, Whitney Roberts, Whitney Walker, Whitney Manchel Washington, Willette Smith, Wilma F Mitchell, Zebera Launius, david Stringfellow. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated inthe Court's Opinion & Order dated June 11, 2019, Bayer's motion for summary judgment isgranted and all remaining member cases in this MDL are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/21/2019)(km) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |