Andrews v. Ravel Hotel LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ann M Donnelly |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02389 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability) |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ravel Hotel LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Victor Andrews
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 07/21 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Victor Andrews (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 07/20 10:50 AM
ORDER -- A review of docket entry7 in this action indicates that the defendant was served with the summons and complaint on May 8, 2017, and its answer was due on May 29, 2017, but to date has not been filed. No later than August 10, 2017, one of the following events must occur: (a) the defendant must file an answer, (b) the parties must file a stipulation extending the defendant's time to answer, or (c) the plaintiff must file a request for a certificate of default. If none of the preceding events occurs by the deadline set forth above, I will deem the plaintiff to have abandoned the case and will promptly file a Report and Recommendation urging the assigned District Judge to dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. The plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to his client and to the defendant. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/20/2017. (Guy, Alicia) |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/01 12:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victor Andrews. Ravel Hotel LLC served on 5/8/2017, answer due 5/29/2017. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/15 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Seelig on behalf of Victor Andrews (aty to be noticed) (Seelig, Anne) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 11:42 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 11:41 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 11:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Ravel Hotel LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/21 1:22 PM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Victor Andrews (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Ravel Hotel LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9467662, filed by Victor Andrews. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 11:38 AM
Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |