Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Lennox et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kiyo A Matsumoto |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02402 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:45 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
Scaramuzzini James
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Robert J. Lennox
|
|
Defendant
Scaramuzzini James
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert J. Lennox
|
|
Plaintiff
Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company
139 STATE STREET
MONTPELIER, VT 05601 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/17 2:58 PM
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE: So Ordered.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 7/17/2018. (Williams-Jackson, Sandra) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation
Wed 06/27 11:42 AM
STIPULATION of Discontinuance Request to So Order by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Barnas, Brian) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Fri 06/15 1:40 PM
Letter to Judge Scanlon in response to Court Order by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Barnas, Brian) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/04 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Galvano on behalf of Robert J. Lennox (aty to be noticed) (Galvano, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/22 3:56 PM
STIPULATION To Withdraw Crossclaim Without Prejudice by Scaramuzzini James (Gervasi, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/02 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F. Granville on behalf of Robert J. Lennox (aty to be noticed) (Granville, Steven) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 01/19 11:32 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 1/19/2018 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), all discovery including fact discovery must be completed by 6/15/2018. On or before 6/15/2018, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 7/20/2018, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 8/17/2018, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. Counsel will discuss the possibility of moving the PI claims to state court. The appropriate documents will be filed by 3/2/2018. Discovery is diverted only against the initial action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/19/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 01/19 11:24 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Telephone Conference held on 1/19/2018 in Courtroom 13A South. Brian Barnas appearing for Plaintiff. Joseph Gebwana and Michael Gervasi appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #10:38-11:07.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/02 2:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Conference is set for 1/19/2018 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Plaintiff's counsel is to organize a conference call, then phone Chambers at (718) 613-2300 with all counsel on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/2/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Wed 11/08 3:44 PM
ANSWER to11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Robert J. Lennox. (Xanthakis, Anthony) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/08 3:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Robert J. Lennox. (Xanthakis, Anthony) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Fri 11/03 3:13 PM
Letter to Honorable Vera M. Scanlon by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Barnas, Brian) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 10/30 11:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer with Affirmative Defenses and Crossclaim served on Robert Lennox on October 20, 2017, filed by Scaramuzzini James. (Gervasi, Michael) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Thu 10/19 10:16 AM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information15 ANSWER to11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against Robert J. Lennox by Scaramuzzini James. (Gervasi, Michael). An Affidavit of Service was filed instead of an Answer. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Mon 10/16 11:59 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer with Affirmative Defenses and Crossclaim served on Robert Lennox on 10/11/2017, filed by Scaramuzzini James. (Gervasi, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Status Report Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 09/26 12:29 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: As discussed during the 9/26/2017 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), Defendant Scaramuzzini is trying to serve Mr. Lennox in Florida. Plaintiff to mail Mr. Lennox at both addresses as well as counsel who called on Mr. Lennox's behalf, copies of complaint, summaries and this Order. On or before 11/3/2017, the Parties will file a joint status report letter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 9/26/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Tue 09/26 11:57 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/26/2017 in Courtroom 13A South. Brian D. Barnas appearing for Plaintiff. Michael Vincent Gervasi appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #10:09-10:40.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Thu 09/21 12:09 PM
Letter in accordance with Court's Initial Conference Order by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Barnas, Brian) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 09/21 9:47 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Barnas, Brian) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Mon 08/14 3:56 PM
Answer with Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim ANSWER to1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Robert J. Lennox by Scaramuzzini James. (Gervasi, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/21 2:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company re9 Scheduling Order, (Barnas, Brian) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/10 9:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 9/26/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 504 North. Plaintiff's counsel is ordered to serve this Order on Defendant's counsel, and to file an affidavit of service by 7/24/2017. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 9/21/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/10/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/22 9:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Robert J. Lennox served on 6/5/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (Wilewicz, Agnieszka) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Agnieszka Anna Wilewicz on behalf of Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Wilewicz, Agnieszka) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 12:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Scaramuzzini James, Robert J. Lennox. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 12:41 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 12:40 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 12:39 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/21 3:51 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Barnas, Brian) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/21 3:50 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Barnas, Brian) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Scaramuzzini James, Robert J. Lennox filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9468614 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Union Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Barnas, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |