Harrison et al v. Davol Inc et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Donald C Coggins, Jr |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-01033 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
CR Bard Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Davol Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District per MDL
Tue 08/14 3:00 PM
Case transferred to Southern District of Ohio per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 1. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (alew, ) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 05/14 2:48 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Motion to Stay All Proceedings 34 . Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/14/2018.(abuc) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Stay
Fri 04/27 9:27 AM
MOTION to Stay All Proceedings by CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc. Response to Motion due by 5/11/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Rogers, James) (Main Document 34 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 4/27/2018) (abuc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - MDL Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - MDL Motion Supporting Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Second Amended Schedule of Related Cases | ||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Tue 01/09 9:39 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Timothy M Cain no longer assigned to the case. (suro) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/05 12:20 PM
CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/12/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/12/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/10/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/14/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/26/2018, Discovery due by 11/16/2018, Mediation Due by 11/30/2018, Motions due by 11/30/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 12/14/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 1/8/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 1/5/18. (kmca) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 01/05 9:17 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc. (Rogers, James) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 01/04 11:35 AM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report, Joint LR 26.03s, Joint ADR/Mediation Statement by CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc, David Harrison.(Rogers, James) Modified on 1/4/2018: to add text, to add joint filer as listed on document (kmca) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 12/11 1:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss Two Causes of Action Asserted in Plaintiff's 21 First Amended Complaint Response filed by David Harrison.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/18/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Thomas, Brady) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Mediation Order
Fri 12/01 3:11 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 5/23/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/1/17. (kmca) |
|
25 | 25
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/01 3:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/21/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/4/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 1/4/2018, ADR Statement due by 1/4/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/14/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/16/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/16/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/16/2018, Discovery due by 5/16/2018, Motions due by 5/30/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/6/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 8/6/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/1/17. (kmca) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 11/28 11:18 AM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint by CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc.(Rogers, James) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 11/28 11:04 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Rogers, James) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 11/14 5:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED against All Defendants, filed by David Harrison. Service due by 2/12/2018 (Haltiwanger, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
12
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Strike
Wed 11/08 4:41 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs shall have fifteen days to file an amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 11/8/17.(kmca) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Suggestion of Death
Fri 10/06 9:24 AM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff, Lynn Harrison by David Harrison. (Haltiwanger, Daniel) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/07 12:49 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Matthew D Jacobson and Eric L Alexander added for Defendants. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 7/7/17.(kmca) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Mon 07/03 12:32 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric L. Alexander ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7235341) by CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/17/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Rogers, James) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Mon 07/03 11:37 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew D. Jacobson ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7235308) by CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/17/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Rogers, James) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 06/23 10:56 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike Response filed by CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc. (Rogers, James) |
|
10 | 10
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 06/23 10:53 AM
Defendants Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc.(Rogers, James) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 06/16 9:57 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Strike Response filed by Lynn Harrison.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/23/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Haltiwanger, Daniel) Modified on 6/16/2017 to edit text (alew, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit-Order in 3:15-cv-2198-TLW | ||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 06/05 5:42 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc. Response to Motion due by 6/19/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Rogers, James) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/21 3:47 PM
Summons Issued as to CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc.(kmca) |
|
Att: 1 Summons CR Bard Inc | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 04/21 3:44 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Harrison, Lynn Harrison.(kmca) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/21 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT against CR Bard Inc, Davol Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7114340), filed by Lynn Harrison, David Harrison. Service due by 7/20/2017.(kmca) |