Lopez v. Kettle Pie Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nicholas G Garaufis |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02421 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 20, 2017 5:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kettle Pie Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Romuald Szumilo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sam Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 03/06 9:33 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, without costs and attorney's fees to either party against the other and that each party waives all rights of appeal with respect to such dismissal. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/27/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 02/08 9:30 AM
ORDER re18 Stipulation of Dismissal -- In light of the parties' stipulation of dismissal, all conferences scheduled before me are cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/8/2018. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 02/07 8:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Sam Lopez (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/07 12:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER -- The status conference previously scheduled for February 7, 2018 is rescheduled for February 8, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed in advance of the conference, I will cancel it; otherwise, counsel shall be prepared to set an expedited schedule for the completion of all remaining pretrial tasks. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/7/2018. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 01/23 12:14 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The parties reported their settlement agreement over a month ago and provide no explanation for the delay in stipulating to the dismissal of the case. The conference previously scheduled for January 25, 2018 is adjourned, but the parties' counsel shall appear for a conference on February 7, 2018, at 12:30 p.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed in advance of the conference, I will cancel it; otherwise, counsel shall be prepared to set an expedited schedule for the completion of all remaining pretrial tasks. I will approve no further delay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/23/2018. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 01/22 10:10 PM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference on January 25, 2018, at 12:30 pm by Sam Lopez. (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 01/12 8:37 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Kettle Pie Inc., Romuald Szumilo. (Postrygacz, Neil) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 01/12 11:23 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted. The telephone conference previously scheduled for January 12, 2018 is cancelled. An in-person status conference will be held on January 25, 2018 at 12:30 p.m., at which I will set an expedited schedule for completing any remaining pretrial tasks. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 1/12/2018. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 12/13 5:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re15 Notice of Settlement -- The pretrial conference previously scheduled for December 14, 2017 is cancelled. A telephone conference will be held on January 12, 2018, at 12:30 p.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed by January 10, 2018, I will cancel the conference; otherwise, counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call and conference in chambers when all parties are on the line. All parties are directed to use landlines rather than mobile telephones in order to reduce potential interference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/13/2017. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 12/12 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Adjournment of Conference by Sam Lopez (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 12/12 2:35 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Kettle Pie Inc., Romuald Szumilo. (Postrygacz, Neil) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 12/12 3:36 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted. The pretrial conference previously scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on December 14, 2017 is rescheduled for 3:00 p.m. on December 14, 2017 ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance). Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 12/12/2017. (Salvador, Anjali) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/01 8:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Andrew Paltzik on behalf of Kettle Pie Inc., Romuald Szumilo (aty to be noticed) (Paltzik, Edward) |
|
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/01 12:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: August 4, 2017. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: September 1, 2017. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: October 16, 2017. Fact discovery to be completed by: November 20, 2017. Expert reports to be completed by: December 1, 2017. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: December 1, 2017. Pretrial Conference ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): December 14, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: December 28, 2017. Joint pretrial order due by: January 25, 2018. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/1/2017. (Orenstein, James) |
|
11 | 11
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 08/01 11:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held on 8/1/2017. SCHEDULING: The next pretrial conference will be held on December 14, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. SUMMARY: I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. (Orenstein, James) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Mon 07/31 10:17 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Sam Lopez (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 07/31 3:17 PM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference on August 1, 2017, at 10:30 am by Sam Lopez. (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Mon 07/31 11:01 AM
ORDER denying8 Motion to Adjourn Conference; denying8 Motion to Appear by Telephone -- In the absence of consent, the motion is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/31/2017. (Klewin, Erin) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 07/31 3:49 PM
ORDER denying9 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- If the point of the proposed adjournment is to postpone the submission of a discovery schedule -- which the movant is confident will be filed within a few days -- there appears to be no reason to believe that an adjournment of that length will do anything other than delay the litigation. Moreover, the movant does not explain why the defendant's counsel was sufficiently reachable to discuss the instant application but not to discuss a discovery plan. The motion is denied. The parties shall submit a joint discovery proposal forthwith. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/31/2017. (Klewin, Erin) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Adjourn Conference Appear by Telephone
Fri 07/28 10:22 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference on August 1, 2017, at 10:30 am or , First Motion to Appear by Telephone on August 1, 2017, at 10:30 am by Sam Lopez. (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/27 3:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, August 1, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than July 28, 2017, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/27/2017. (Guy, Alicia) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 06/13 5:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Postrygacz, Neil) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/18 10:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam Lopez. Kettle Pie Inc. served on 4/28/2017, answer due 5/19/2017. (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 3:22 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 3:22 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Sunday, April 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 3:21 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Romuald summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/23 12:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Kettle Pie Inc., Romuald Szumilo filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9469735 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Sam Lopez. (Demetriades, Tara) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 3:18 PM
Case assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |