McCarthy v. MMR Care Corp. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joan M Azrack |
Referred: | Anne Y Shields |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02425 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 20, 2017 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kimberly Deschamps
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mary Kochaniwsky
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MMR Care Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel McCarthy
|
Represented By
|
1. | Long Island nurse files discrimination lawsuit alleging he was fired after daughter got cancer (nydailynews.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/24/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/08 9:16 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re:13 Stipulation and Order of Final Dismissal with Prejudice. Case Closed. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/7/2017. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/04 2:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice to be So Ordered by Kimberly Deschamps, Mary Kochaniwsky, MMR Care Corp. (Yankovich, Mordy) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 07/28 10:38 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File - Counsel for the plaintiff shall file the stipulation of discontinuance by 8/11/2017. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/28/2017. (Posillico, Lauren) |
||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 07/27 10:20 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Discontinuance by Daniel McCarthy. (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 07/06 10:28 AM
ORDER : Based on the representation that this matter has settled, the initial conference scheduled on 7/19/2017 is hereby cancelled. A stipulation of discontinuance should be filed by 7/28/2017. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/6/2017. (Posillico, Lauren) |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Wed 07/05 3:55 PM
Letter to Court re Settlement by Kimberly Deschamps, Mary Kochaniwsky, MMR Care Corp. (Shields, Ana) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/20 11:35 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 7/19/2017 at 2:30 PM before Judge Joan M. Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/20/2017. (Posillico, Lauren) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 06/13 5:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Shields, Ana) |
|
9 | 9
discov
Disclosure of Interested Parties
Tue 06/13 5:01 PM
DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Kimberly Deschamps, Mary Kochaniwsky, MMR Care Corp.. (Shields, Ana) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/24 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mordy Yankovich on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Yankovich, Mordy) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/24 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Shields on behalf of Kimberly Deschamps, Mary Kochaniwsky, MMR Care Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Shields, Ana) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 3:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Kimberly Deschamps. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 3:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Mary Kochaniwsky. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 3:43 PM
Summons Issued as to MMR Care Corp.. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 3:34 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 3:31 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 3:33 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
Sunday, April 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Sun 04/23 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Kimberly Deschamps(in her professional capacities ), Kimberly Deschamps(in her individual capacities ), Mary Kochaniwsky(in her professional capacities ), Mary Kochaniwsky(in her individual capacities), MMR Care Corp. d/b/a Daleview Care Center filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9469751 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Daniel McCarthy. (Pearson, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons to MMR Care Corp. d/b/a Daleview Care Center, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons to Mary Kochaniwsky, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons to Kimberly Deschamps |