Gnegy v. Welch et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Richard D Bennett |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01100 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983cvp Civil Rights (Personal Property) |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
Brian Frosh
|
|
Defendant
Lisa Thayer Welch
|
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Earl Gnegy
8840 Garrett Hwy
Oak Land, MD 21550 |
GPO
May 17 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/17/2017. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Wed 05/17 12:52 PM
ORDER DISMISSING1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/17/2017. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
4
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Wed 05/17 12:50 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/17/2017. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 9:07 AM
COMPLAINT against Brian Frosh, Lisa Thayer Welch ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637097337.), filed by Johnny Earl Gnegy.(bas, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 All Exhibits - Filed Separately, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |