Gilbert v. Berryhill
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Paula Xinis |
Referred: | Stephanie A Gallagher |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-01111 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:402 Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nancy Berryhill
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SSA Notify
|
|
Plaintiff
Tchikens Luasambu Gilbert
13927 Castle Blvd., #34
Silver Spring, MD 20904 |
GPO
Feb 27 2018
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nancy Berryhill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 2/26/2018. (c/m 2/27/18 cags, Deputy Clerk) |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 03/23 1:44 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting17 Motion for Summary Judgment; affirming the Social Security Administration's Judgment; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/22/2018. (c/m 03/23/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 03/09 9:51 AM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion of Reconsideration for Summary Judgment by Tchikens Luasambu Gilbert re21 Report and Recommendations.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments | ||
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/27 12:29 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nancy Berryhill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 2/26/2018. (c/m 2/27/18 cags, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Supplemental
Thu 02/15 5:21 PM
Supplemental to1 Complaint filed by Tchikens Luasambu Gilbert (tds, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 02/15 5:18 PM
RESPONSE (Motion) in Opposition re17 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tchikens Luasambu Gilbert. (tds, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Rule 12/56
Tue 01/30 3:39 PM
Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Tchikens Luasambu Gilbert (c/m 01/30/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 01/29 11:12 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Nancy Berryhill(Hinsley, Jay) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Supplemental
Tue 01/23 9:56 AM
Supplemental to1 Complaint filed by Tchikens Luasambu Gilbert(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 01/23 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Tchikens Luasambu Gilbert (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 12/19 4:23 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 12/19/2017. (c/m 12/19/2017 aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 12/15 2:39 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Nancy Berryhill(Hinsley, Jay) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/17 1:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/17/2017. (c/m 8/17/2017 aos, Deputy Clerk) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/17 8:21 AM
Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 8/17/2017. (cags, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 08/09 2:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nancy Berryhill re8 Transcript,9 Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order (Hinsley, Jay) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order
Wed 08/09 2:30 PM
Proposed Social Security Scheduling Order submitted by Nancy Berryhill(Hinsley, Jay) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Transcript
Wed 08/09 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings(Hinsley, Jay) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 08/01 4:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Nancy Berryhill served on 6/15/2017; Acting United States Attorney General for the District of Maryland served on 06/30/2017; United States Attorney served on 06/24/2017(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Returned Executed, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Returned Executed | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/25 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jay C Hinsley on behalf of Nancy Berryhill(Hinsley, Jay) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 05/16 3:29 PM
Summons Issued 60 days as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 05/16 3:28 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to prepare and issue summons to be served by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/16/2017. (c/m 05/16/2017 jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/16 2:06 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/24 2:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tchikens Luasambu Gilbert(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Office of Disability Adjudication and Review, filed by Tchikens Luasambu Gilbert.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachments |