Suarez v. Your Way Trucking LLC et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lois Bloom |
Referred: | Lois Bloom |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02430 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 5:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
Emmanuel Vandoulakis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Your Way Trucking LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Raymond Nardo
The Law Office of Raymond Nardo 129 Third Street
Mineola, NY 11501 |
|
Plaintiff
Erving Suarez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 11/21 11:02 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed, by and between the undersigned Parties, through their respective counsel, that the above action may be and is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 11/20/2017. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 11/16 4:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Erving Suarez (Rumack, Darren) |
|
18 | 18
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Thu 11/16 3:19 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Settlement as modified: For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, plaintiff's motion for settlement agreement, as modified herein, is approved. The parties shall file a stipulation discontinuing this case by December 6, 2017. See Attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 11/16/2017. (Doody, Sara) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 11/03 3:54 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom for all further proceedings. Judge Ann M. Donnelly no longer assigned to case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Greene, Donna) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred
Fri 11/03 3:52 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. (Greene, Donna) |
||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 11/02 4:40 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Erving Suarez. (Rumack, Darren) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Wed 11/01 4:08 PM
ORDER: The parties filed their request for settlement approval on October 31, 2017. (ECF No. 15.) Judge Donnelly referred the parties' motion for settlement approval to me for a Report and Recommendation. However, if both sides consent to a Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), a Report and Recommendation will not be necessary as settlement approval can then be entered by Order. If the parties consent, they shall file a form AO 85, "Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge," by November 8, 2017. The fillable consent form AO 85 is available at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/forms/allforms/general_forms and must be signed by all parties and filed electronically. Otherwise, I shall issue a Report and Recommendation to Judge Donnelly for her consideration. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 11/1/2017. (Doody, Sara) |
||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Settlement
Tue 10/31 12:43 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and request for approval pursuant to the FLSA by Erving Suarez (Rumack, Darren) Modified on 10/31/2017 to a motion.(Greene, Donna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit settlement agreement and billing information | ||
order
Order Referring Motion
Tue 10/31 2:52 PM
ORDER RESPECTFULLY REFERRING MOTION:15 MOTION for Settlement filed by Erving Suarez respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 10/31/2017. Motion respectfully referred to Lois Bloom. (Greene, Donna) |
||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
adr
Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled)
Thu 09/28 3:47 PM
REPORT of Mediation settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report Questionnaires due by 10/26/2017. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
adr
Selection of Mediator
Thu 08/03 5:16 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Raymond Nardo selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on 9/28/17, 10:00 am; EDNY Brooklyn. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned to Robyn Weinstein, ADR Administrator, Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Report of Mediation due by 9/28/2017. (Rumack, Darren) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
adr
Mediation Instructions
Fri 07/28 4:31 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Thu 07/27 5:02 PM
Minute Entry for initial conference held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/27/2017. (Tape #2:38 - 2:51.) (Doody, Sara) |
||
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation
Thu 07/27 5:04 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: The Court held an initial conference today in plaintiff's Fair Labor Standards Act case. As discussed on the record, the Court hereby refers the instant action to Court annexed mediation. The parties are directed to contact Robyn Weinstein, the Court's ADR Administrator, at (718) 613-2578. The parties shall select a mediator by August 28, 2017. The mediation must be completed by September 29, 2017. The parties shall file a letter regarding the status of mediation by October 6, 2017. If the parties reach an agreement in principle to settle the case, they must immediately advise the Court and promptly submit a motion to approve the settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/27/2017. (Doody, Sara) |
||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 07/20 11:42 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Rumack, Darren) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Wed 07/05 4:31 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition by Emmanuel Vandoulakis, Your Way Trucking LLC. (Joelson, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Rule 26(a) Disclosure Rule 26 (a)(1) Initial Discovery | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/29 1:38 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants filed an answer to plaintiff's complaint on June 28, 2017. (ECF No. 11.) The Court shall hold an initial conference on July 27, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) and file the Rule 26(f) meeting report by July 20, 2017. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/29/2017. (Smith, Roberta) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/28 3:42 PM
Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Joelson, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 06/06 8:59 AM
ENDORSED ORDER, granting the parties'9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: It is hereby Stipulated, that the time for the defendants, Emmanuel Vandoulakis and Your Way Trucking LLC , to appear and to answer, amend or supplement the answer as of course or to make any motion with relation to the summons or to the complaint in this action, be and the same hereby is extended to and including the 1st day of July, 2017 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 6/5/2017. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 06/02 10:38 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Emmanuel Vandoulakis. (Joelson, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 letter to go with Stip to Extend Time to Answer | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/15 5:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erving Suarez. Your Way Trucking LLC served on 5/8/2017, answer due 5/29/2017. (Rumack, Darren) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/09 2:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erving Suarez. Emmanuel Vandoulakis served on 5/3/2017, answer due 5/24/2017. (Rumack, Darren) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 3:38 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 3:37 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 3:36 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/24 10:56 AM
Proposed Summons. by Erving Suarez (Rumack, Darren) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/24 10:55 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Erving Suarez (Rumack, Darren) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 10:55 AM
COMPLAINT against Emmanuel Vandoulakis, Your Way Trucking LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9470854 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Erving Suarez. (Rumack, Darren) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 3:34 PM
Case assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |