Benson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | David E Jones |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00571 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Tue 11/21 3:07 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by by Magistrate Judge David E Jones. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff)(blr) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 11/16 1:53 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED for lack of diligence pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) and E.D. Wis. Civ. L. R. 41(c). (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff)(blr) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 10/12 12:22 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before October 31, 2017, Mr. Benson shall show cause as to why he should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with Court orders. Failure to file such a response on or before October 31, 2017, will result in dismissal of this action for lack of diligence pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) and E.D. Wis. Civ. L. R. 41(c). (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff)(blr) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/21 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Levitt on behalf of Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Attorney(s) appearing: David Levitt (Levitt, David) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
socsec
Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript
Thu 05/25 11:01 AM
Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Transcript, | ||
Att: 2 Transcript, | ||
Att: 3 Transcript, | ||
Att: 4 Transcript, | ||
Att: 5 Transcript, | ||
Att: 6 Transcript, | ||
Att: 7 Transcript, | ||
Att: 8 Transcript, | ||
Att: 9 Transcript, | ||
Att: 10 Transcript, | ||
Att: 11 Transcript, | ||
Att: 12 Transcript, | ||
Att: 13 Transcript, | ||
Att: 14 Transcript, | ||
Att: 15 Transcript, | ||
Att: 16 Certificate of Service | ||
11 | 11
socsec
Certificate of Service - Social Security Transcript
Thu 05/25 10:58 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (Pawlak, Brian) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
socsec
Return of Service
Mon 05/08 2:04 PM
Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 5/3/2017. (blr) |
|
9 | 9
socsec
Briefing Letter
Mon 05/08 9:08 AM
Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiff's brief due August 16, 2017; Defendant's response due September 25, 2017; Plaintiff's reply due October 9, 2017. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff) (blr) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
socsec
Return of Service
Thu 05/04 3:26 PM
Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/28/17. (kmf) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge on Consent
Thu 05/04 2:19 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/4/17. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David E Jones for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel, Plaintiff)(gc) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 05/04 2:15 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge David E Jones. Judge Lynn Adelman no longer assigned to the case. (bx) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 05/02 3:51 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth L Benson. (blr) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/26 3:42 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration.(Pawlak, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Wed 04/26 11:54 AM
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/26/17 granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. The file will be returned to the Clerk of Courts for service on defendant. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (gc) |
|
socsec
Transmittal of Complaint and Order
Wed 04/26 1:18 PM
Transmit1 Complaint and4 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Mon 04/24 3:36 PM
LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (blr) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Mon 04/24 2:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Kenneth L Benson. (blr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Social Security
Mon 04/24 2:48 PM
PRO SE SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Kenneth L Benson.(blr) |